Smith v. Pizza Hut, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01632
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER Granting Approval of Settlement. The parties Unopposed Motion to Approve Collective Action Settlement (Doc. # 464 ) is GRANTED. This Action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety, on the merits, as against Defendant WITH PREJUDICE, and witho ut costs to any party, except to the extent otherwise expressly provided in the Settlement. This Court intends this Order of Approval to be "Final" within the meaning of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/26/2015. (athom, )
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MINUTE ORDER granting 438 Second Joint Motion to Conduct Additional Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/19/2014. (athom, )
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting 432 Joint Motion to Conduct Additional Discovery. Discovery due by 7/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/22/2014.(athom, )
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/1/14. The parties shall file a motion for additional discovery on or before April 14, 2014; and the parties shall submit a revised proposed final pretrial order on or before May5, 2014, modified as discussed at the final pretrial conference. (bsimm)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/13/14. 383 MOTION for Hearing/Conference for Amendment of Scheduling Order Regarding Depositions and for Rescheduling of Proposed Pretrial Order and Final Pretrial Conference (Expedited) filed b y Pizza Hut, Inc. is DENIED as follows: (1) The final pretrial conference remains set for April 1, 2014, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado; and (2) The request for additional depositions of trial witnesses is denied subject to review after the final pretrial order is entered. (BWS)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER re: 378 Joint Status Report by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/3/13. (dkals, )
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting 375 Expedited Joint Stipulated Motion for Limited Stay Pending Mediation. Status Report due by 12/1/2013. Discovery due by 2/28/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/13.(bnbcd, )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting 357 Motion Maintain Restricted Access to Confidential Exhibits to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/1/13.(dkals, )
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 342 Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/23/13.(bnbcd, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2013. 342 Plaintiffss Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 345 Motion for Leave to Res trict Document is DENIED. Either party may re-file Motion to Restrict within two weeks of today, pursuant to the Court's instructions. Expert deadline extended to July 1, 2013, rebuttal expert deadline extended to August 1, 2013. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER: Deadlines and case schedule as set forth in status conference on 2/5/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/5/13. (bnbcd, )
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 337 AMENDED ORDER re: 335 Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/12. (dkals, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 250 Joint Motion to Vacate or Extend Existing Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/22/12. All current deadlines are VACATED. (jjpsl, )
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Specifically, Count II is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of standing. Defendants Motion to Dismiss with regard to all other aspects of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is DENIED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/14/2011.(erv, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying 192 Motion to Stay Briefing on Conditional Certification as premature by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/2/2011.(erv, ) (Modified on 5/3/2011 corrected typing errors)(erv, ).
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER The stay of discovery previously entered, see Order 174 , is LIFTED, and discovery may proceed subject to the limits established in the Scheduling Order 47 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/4/2011. (See Order for Complete Details)(erv, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: re: 162 Pizza Huts Motion and Memorandum of Law for a Temporary Protective Order for Six Weeks is granted. All discovery is STAYED pending further order of the court. Status Report due by 1/21/2011. Status Conference set for 1/31/2011 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/8/10. (bnbcd, )
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of the Court shall accept for filing the Second Amended Complaint. The Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond by 09/08/10. Order granting 139 Motion to Seal. Order denying as moot 106 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/10/10.(jjh, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 117 Pizza Hut's Unopposed Motion to Clarify 116 Order. The Order is clarified to state that all deadlines established by the 47 Scheduling Order as subsequently modified are VACATED. I will enter a new case schedule, if appropriate, after a ruling by the district judge on Pizza Huts Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/10/2010.(wjc, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying as premature 114 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a status report within ten days of any ruling on Pizza Huts Rule 12(b)(6) Motion informing me of the status of the case and recommending pretrial matters, if any, to be scheduled, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/4/10.(bnbcd, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Dismiss 22 must be GRANTED. The Court, however, GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file within twenty-one (21) days an amended complaint that complies with the Twombly/Iqbal plausibility standard Plaintiffs cannot, in good faith4, file such a complaint, or if Plaintiffs file nothing within twenty-one (21) days, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/11/2010. (erv, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER: granting 93 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding the Deadline for Moving to Enlarge the Number of Depositions. The deadline to move to enlarge the number of depositions contained in Part 8.h.1 of the Scheduling Order 47 is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/11/10.(bnbcd, ) (Modified on 2/19/2010 corrected link to Order, filing date of 2/1/2010 corrected)(erv, ).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 50 Pizza Hut's Partially Unopposed MOTION to Amend 47 and Clarify Scheduling Order. The deadline for plaintiffs to submit to defendants a proposed notice of action and to opt-in (October 21, 2009); deadline for defendants to s ubmit to plaintiffs proposed modifications to the notice of action and to opt-in (November 4, 2009); deadline to file proposed notice of action and to opt-in (November 18, 2009); and deadline for collective action plaintiffs to opt-in (February 19, 2 010) are VACATED; The status conferences set for December 15, 2009, and January 12, 2010, are VACATED; and The deadline to file motion to conditionally certify collective action of April 20, 2010, is VACATED and RESET to January 4, 2010. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that the parties shall address the content of any notice ofaction and to opt-in and a deadline for opting-in in their briefs concerning conditional certification. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in order to clarify the uncertainty, the expert discovery cut-off is August 20, 2010, and the dispositive motion deadline is September 20, 2010. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/16/09. (erv, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/11/09. (bnbcd, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: re: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2009 3:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall prepare a revised proposed scheduling order and shall submit it to the court on orbefore September 28, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/2/09. (bnbcd, ) (Modified on 9/2/2009 corrected time to 3:30 PM)(erv2, ).
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/30/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Pizza Hut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?