March 26, 2015 |
Filing
466
ORDER Granting Approval of Settlement. The parties Unopposed Motion to Approve Collective Action Settlement (Doc. # 464 ) is GRANTED. This Action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety, on the merits, as against Defendant WITH PREJUDICE, and witho ut costs to any party, except to the extent otherwise expressly provided in the Settlement. This Court intends this Order of Approval to be "Final" within the meaning of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/26/2015. (athom, )
|
May 19, 2014 |
Filing
440
MINUTE ORDER granting 438 Second Joint Motion to Conduct Additional Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/19/2014. (athom, )
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing
434
ORDER granting 432 Joint Motion to Conduct Additional Discovery. Discovery due by 7/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/22/2014.(athom, )
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
425
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/1/14. The parties shall file a motion for additional discovery on or before April 14, 2014; and the parties shall submit a revised proposed final pretrial order on or before May5, 2014, modified as discussed at the final pretrial conference. (bsimm)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
389
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/13/14. 383 MOTION for Hearing/Conference for Amendment of Scheduling Order Regarding Depositions and for Rescheduling of Proposed Pretrial Order and Final Pretrial Conference (Expedited) filed b y Pizza Hut, Inc. is DENIED as follows: (1) The final pretrial conference remains set for April 1, 2014, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado; and (2) The request for additional depositions of trial witnesses is denied subject to review after the final pretrial order is entered. (BWS)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
379
ORDER re: 378 Joint Status Report by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/3/13. (dkals, )
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
377
ORDER granting 375 Expedited Joint Stipulated Motion for Limited Stay Pending Mediation. Status Report due by 12/1/2013. Discovery due by 2/28/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/13.(bnbcd, )
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
358
ORDER granting 357 Motion Maintain Restricted Access to Confidential Exhibits to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/1/13.(dkals, )
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
356
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 342 Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/23/13.(bnbcd, )
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
353
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2013. 342 Plaintiffss Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 345 Motion for Leave to Res trict Document is DENIED. Either party may re-file Motion to Restrict within two weeks of today, pursuant to the Court's instructions. Expert deadline extended to July 1, 2013, rebuttal expert deadline extended to August 1, 2013. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
|
February 5, 2013 |
Filing
341
ORDER: Deadlines and case schedule as set forth in status conference on 2/5/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/5/13. (bnbcd, )
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing
337
AMENDED ORDER re: 335 Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/12. (dkals, )
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
253
ORDER granting 250 Joint Motion to Vacate or Extend Existing Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/22/12. All current deadlines are VACATED. (jjpsl, )
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
201
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Specifically, Count II is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of standing. Defendants Motion to Dismiss with regard to all other aspects of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is DENIED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/14/2011.(erv, )
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing
196
ORDER denying 192 Motion to Stay Briefing on Conditional Certification as premature by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/2/2011.(erv, ) (Modified on 5/3/2011 corrected typing errors)(erv, ).
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing
186
ORDER The stay of discovery previously entered, see Order 174 , is LIFTED, and discovery may proceed subject to the limits established in the Scheduling Order 47 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/4/2011. (See Order for Complete Details)(erv, )
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing
174
ORDER: re: 162 Pizza Huts Motion and Memorandum of Law for a Temporary Protective Order for Six Weeks is granted. All discovery is STAYED pending further order of the court. Status Report due by 1/21/2011. Status Conference set for 1/31/2011 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/8/10. (bnbcd, )
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER granting 131 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of the Court shall accept for filing the Second Amended Complaint. The Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond by 09/08/10. Order granting 139 Motion to Seal. Order denying as moot 106 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/10/10.(jjh, )
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
119
ORDER granting 117 Pizza Hut's Unopposed Motion to Clarify 116 Order. The Order is clarified to state that all deadlines established by the 47 Scheduling Order as subsequently modified are VACATED. I will enter a new case schedule, if appropriate, after a ruling by the district judge on Pizza Huts Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/10/2010.(wjc, )
|
May 4, 2010 |
Filing
116
ORDER denying as premature 114 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a status report within ten days of any ruling on Pizza Huts Rule 12(b)(6) Motion informing me of the status of the case and recommending pretrial matters, if any, to be scheduled, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/4/10.(bnbcd, )
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Dismiss 22 must be GRANTED. The Court, however, GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file within twenty-one (21) days an amended complaint that complies with the Twombly/Iqbal plausibility standard Plaintiffs cannot, in good faith4, file such a complaint, or if Plaintiffs file nothing within twenty-one (21) days, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/11/2010. (erv, )
|
February 1, 2010 |
Filing
95
MINUTE ORDER: granting 93 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding the Deadline for Moving to Enlarge the Number of Depositions. The deadline to move to enlarge the number of depositions contained in Part 8.h.1 of the Scheduling Order 47 is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/11/10.(bnbcd, ) (Modified on 2/19/2010 corrected link to Order, filing date of 2/1/2010 corrected)(erv, ).
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
62
ORDER Granting 50 Pizza Hut's Partially Unopposed MOTION to Amend 47 and Clarify Scheduling Order. The deadline for plaintiffs to submit to defendants a proposed notice of action and to opt-in (October 21, 2009); deadline for defendants to s ubmit to plaintiffs proposed modifications to the notice of action and to opt-in (November 4, 2009); deadline to file proposed notice of action and to opt-in (November 18, 2009); and deadline for collective action plaintiffs to opt-in (February 19, 2 010) are VACATED; The status conferences set for December 15, 2009, and January 12, 2010, are VACATED; and The deadline to file motion to conditionally certify collective action of April 20, 2010, is VACATED and RESET to January 4, 2010. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that the parties shall address the content of any notice ofaction and to opt-in and a deadline for opting-in in their briefs concerning conditional certification. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in order to clarify the uncertainty, the expert discovery cut-off is August 20, 2010, and the dispositive motion deadline is September 20, 2010. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/16/09. (erv, )
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing
40
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/11/09. (bnbcd, )
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
32
ORDER: re: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2009 3:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall prepare a revised proposed scheduling order and shall submit it to the court on orbefore September 28, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/2/09. (bnbcd, ) (Modified on 9/2/2009 corrected time to 3:30 PM)(erv2, ).
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing
14
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/30/09. (bnbcd, )
|