Walker v. University of Colorado - Board of Regents
Plaintiff: George W. Walker
Defendant: University of Colorado - Board of Regents
Case Number: 1:2009cv01690
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying without prejudice 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Documents, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/4/11.(mnf, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER accepting 113 Recommendation on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 74 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendant and against plaintiff on all claims, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/14/10.(ebs, )
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 118 Plaintiff's Motion to Obtain an Injunction to Halt "World Class" Assessment Before Getting "World Class" Funding, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/25/10.(ebs, )
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER striking 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Remove 10-1397 and 09-cv-01690-PAB-MEH Out of the 10th Circuit/Colo. District, or Expedite it to the U.S. Supreme Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/1/2010. (mehcd)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER denying 101 Plaintiff's renewed Request for Change of Venue, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/18/2010. (mehcd)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER accepting in part and rejecting in part 63 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Equal Protection and Title VII discrimination claims survive defendant's motion. Plaintiff's Title VII retaliation claim and his due process claim are dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/16/10.(ebs, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 98 Plaintiff's Motion for a Change of Venue, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/12/2010. (mehcd)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER denying 91 Plaintiff's Request that the Court Contact Dr. Scott Sutton at the Eastside Health Clinic to Obtain an Objective Mental Health Professional of Color, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/16/10.(ebs, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Require the Defendant to Produce Documents in Accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/28/2010. (mehcd)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Delay, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/26/2010. (mehcd)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 69 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Add the 1991 U.S.C.R. Act, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/14/2010. (mehcd)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Required Joinder/Pleading Doc's, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/10/2010. (mehcd)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Order the Defendant to Produce Some Requested Documents, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/2/2010. (mehcd)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's Motion for a Date for the Plaintiff's Reply to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss by 1/29/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/11/10.(ebs, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Plaintiff's Request [Motion] to Clarify Rule. In addition, the Court warns the Plaintiff that he may not file, ex parte, letters or documents with the Court unless such letters or documents are attache d to a request for relief (motion) that complies with D.C. Colo. LCivR 7.1A (and other applicable local rules), or to a response or reply to a motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/6/2010. (mehcd) Modified on 1/7/2010 to add text to clarify this document is a minute order (ebs, ).
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Try to Clarify, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/09.(ebs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion for a Delay, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/22/09.(ebs, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/2009. (sah, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. Plaintiff has 30 days to file either a 1915 motion or pay the filing fee and to file a Title VII complaint on the proper form, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/14/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. University of Colorado - Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Colorado - Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?