Betts v. Karrigan et al
Plaintiff: Terry Betts
Defendant: Liz Karrigan and John E. Orey
Case Number: 1:2009cv01705
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/3/09. (msksec, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/29/09.(wjc, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amened Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/18/09.(wjc, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/6/09. (mskcd)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/3/09. (kmtcd)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 07/30/09. (wjc, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/22/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts v. Karrigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Karrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Orey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?