Mayes v. Arrelano et al
Petitioner: Todd O'Conner Mayes
Respondent: Michael Arrelano and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01736
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RETURNING STATE COURT RECORD. By Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Letter returning state court record) (sah, )
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER to Cure Deficiency. Applicant to cure the deficiencies as set forth in the order within 30 days, re 32 Notice of Appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/25/11. (gmssl, )
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The Recommendation 29 is accepted and adopted in its entirety. The Application for a Writ Of Habeas Corpus Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 2254 2 is denied. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 3/23/2011.(sah, )
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 25 Applicant's Motion for Copy of Documents, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/13/11.(mnf, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. The Applicant's request for a stay and abeyance is denied. Exhausted claim one and the application are drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Unexhausted claims two and three are dismissed voluntarily by Applicant, Todd O'Conner Mayes. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/16/2009. (sah, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/19/09(jjh, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a 1915 motion or pay the filing fee, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/20/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayes v. Arrelano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd O'Conner Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Arrelano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?