Thomas v. Denver Public Library et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Kevin Thomas
Defendant: Denver Public Library, Denver Public Library Commission, The, Kevin O'Conner, Tom (I) Scott, Tom Scott, Pam (I) Tobin, Pam Tobin, Letty (I) Icolari and Letty Icolari
Case Number: 1:2009cv01748
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice and to Close Case. Granting 49 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/21/10.(gmssl, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 49 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Larson, Karen)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Case Caption and Name of Defendant. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint no later than 07/16/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/14/2010.(wjc, )
July 7, 2010 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM regarding 46 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Second Amended Complaint filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/7/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
July 7, 2010 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Larson, Karen)
June 23, 2010 Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Third Motion for Extension of Time for Filing a Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file their stipualated motion to dismiss no later than 6/28/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/23/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
June 21, 2010 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM regarding 43 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 43 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Extension of Time)(Larson, Karen)
May 24, 2010 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 38 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 39 Amended Motion for Extension of Time for Filing a Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file their stipulated motion to dismiss no later than 6/21/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/24/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
May 21, 2010 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding 39 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
May 21, 2010 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
May 21, 2010 Filing 39 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Larson, Karen)
May 21, 2010 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Larson, Karen)
April 22, 2010 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing a Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file their stipulated motion to dismiss no later than 5/21/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/22/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
April 21, 2010 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM regarding 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stiulated Motn to Dismiss filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/21/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
April 21, 2010 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stiulated Motn to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Extension)(Larson, Karen)
March 5, 2010 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Settlement Conference held on 3/5/2010 and a settlement was reached as to all claims in this action. The parties shall file a stipulated motion to dismiss on or before 04/20/2010. (kmtcd, ) Modified on 3/9/2010 to correct typographical error (gms, ).
November 20, 2009 Filing 33 Defendants' AMENDED ANSWER to 23 Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Shirley Amore, Shirley (I) Amore, Thomas Scott, Thomas (I) Scott, City and County of Denver. (wjc, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute ORDER granting 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended 24 Answer by Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Defendants Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint (#26-2) attached to the Motion by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/19/09.(kmtcd)
November 18, 2009 Filing 31 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/18/09. (msksec, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/09. (kmtcd)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/09. (kmtcd)
November 17, 2009 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2009. Discovery due by 5/17/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2010. Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
November 17, 2009 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM regarding 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer filed by Letty (I) Icolari, City and County of Denver, Shirley Amore, Thomas (I) Scott, Shirley (I) Amore, Letty Icolari, Thomas Scott.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/17/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
November 16, 2009 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended 24 Answer by Defendants Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Shirley Amore, Shirley (I) Amore, Thomas Scott, Thomas (I) Scott, City and County of Denver. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Defendants' Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint)(Wolf, Robert) Modified on 11/17/2009 to create linkage (wjc, ).
November 10, 2009 Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Larson, Karen)
October 28, 2009 Filing 24 ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint Second by Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Shirley Amore, Shirley (I) Amore, Thomas Scott, Thomas (I) Scott, City and County of Denver.(Rivera, Joseph) Modified on 10/29/2009 delete duplicate text (wjc, ).
October 16, 2009 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Shirley Amore, Shirley (I) Amore, Thomas Scott, Thomas (I) Scott, City and County of Denver, filed by Kevin Thomas.(Larson, Karen)
October 16, 2009 Filing 22 Docket Annotation re: 21 Amended Document. Counsel informed to refile document using correct event. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 21 AMENDED (Second) Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Larson, Karen)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Amended 19 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 16 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint attached to the Motion (Doc. No. 16-2) omitting the word "proposed," by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/15/2009. (wjc, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER granting 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the SecondAmended Complaint attached to the Motion (Doc. No. 16-2) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/14/09.(kmtcd)
October 6, 2009 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 6 Amended Complaint filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/6/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 6 Amended Complaint Exh 1, Return of Service by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Larson, Karen)
October 5, 2009 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Amend)(Larson, Karen)
September 28, 2009 Filing 15 Defendant Amore's, Icolari's and Scott's ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Shirley Amore, Shirley (I) Amore, Thomas Scott, Thomas (I) Scott.(Wolf, Robert)
September 25, 2009 Filing 14 Docket Annotation re: 11 Notice (Other). Modified on 9/25/2009 to remove filers. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2009 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/09. (kmtcd)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER granting 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling and Planning Conference by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. The 10/21/2009 scheduling conference is VACATED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/09.(kmtcd)
September 24, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE Entry of Appearance by Defendants Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Shirley Amore, Shirley (I) Amore, Thomas Scott, Thomas (I) Scott, Denver Public Library, Denver Public Library Commission, The.(Wolf, Robert) Modified on 9/25/2009 to remove filers (wjc, ).
September 22, 2009 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling and Planning Conference filed by Kevin Thomas.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/22/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling and Planning Conference by Plaintiff Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Continuance)(Larson, Karen)
August 27, 2009 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Kevin Thomas.(Larson, Karen)
August 27, 2009 Filing 7 Docket Annotation re: 6 Amended Complaint. Counsel filed document prior to all parties being added. Counsel informed to refile document and select named parties. Text only entry - no document attached. (wjc, )
August 25, 2009 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Denver Public Library, Denver Public Library Commission, The, Kevin O'Conner, Tom (I) Scott, Tom Scott, filed by Kevin Thomas.(Larson, Karen)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/6/09. (mskcd)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONCERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/30/09. (kmtcd)
July 27, 2009 Filing 3 Docket Annotation re: 1 Complaint. This docket entry was modified to add corrected receipt. Text only entry - no document attached (gmssl, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND LETTER TO COUNSEL: REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 07/27/09. (wjc, )
July 23, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Letty (I) Icolari, Letty Icolari, Denver Public Library, Denver Public Library Commission, The, Kevin O'Conner, Tom (I) Scott, Tom Scott, Pam (I) Tobin, Pam Tobin ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 20692) Summons Issued, filed by Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(jak, ) (Corrected receipt added on 7/27/2009: # 3 Corrected Receipt) (gmssl, ). Modified on 7/27/2009 to add corrected receipt (gmssl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Denver Public Library et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Thomas
Represented By: Karen Hendrick Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public Library Commission, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom (I) Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam (I) Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letty (I) Icolari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letty Icolari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?