St. Veltri v. Zavaras et al
Petitioner: James St. Veltri
Respondent: Ari Zavaras, Brill and John W. Suthers
Case Number: 1:2009cv01844
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER returning 29 State Court Records, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/15/2011. (erv, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (mnf, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: On or before 05/07/2010 the Clerk of Court, Denver County District Court, Colorado, shall provide to this Court the original written record of case no. 04 CR 3755, People v. Veltri, including all hearing and trial transcripts. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the Clerk of Court, Denver County District Court by regular mail, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/07/2010. (wjc, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. The Applicant's " Motion Redirecting This Court to Rule on 'Only' Any and All Violations of Fourth Amendment of the U.S. and State of Colorad o Constitutions Over Illegal Search & Seizure" filed on 11/30/2009, is granted and Applicant's due process claim in the amended application filed on 08/12/2009, is dismissed. The perjury portion of Applicant's Fourth Amendment claim in the amended application filed on 08/ 12/2009, is dismissed as procedurally barred. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/20/2010.(sah, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a complete complaint on the proper court form, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/3/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Veltri v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James St. Veltri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ari Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?