Martinez v. Green et al
Petitioner: Domingo Martinez, Jr.
Respondent: Steve Green and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01925
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The 23 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Petitioner's 3 Amended Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to follow court orders and to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1M. There is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/22/11.(mnf, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The Clerk of the Denver County District Court shall provide to this Court the original written record of Denver County District Court Case No. 05CR4369, People v. Domingo Martinez. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the Clerk of the Denver District Court by regular mail to Clerk of the Denver District Court, 1437 Bannock Street, Room 256, Denver, CO 80202. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/28/2010. (mehcd)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Draw In Part and to Dismiss In Part. Claim One is dismissed for the reasons stated in this Order. Claims Two and Three shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/19/2009. (sah, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/28/09. (jjh, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/19/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Domingo Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?