WESTLB AG, New York Branch v. DT Land Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WESTLB AG, New York Branch
Defendant: DT Land Development, LLC, CV Land & Development Company, LLC, Terry D. Corlis and Donald R. Vernon
Case Number: 1:2009cv01931
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Of Dismissal APPROVING 110 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/12. (mjgsl, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. This action is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk is DIRECTED to close this civil action administratively, subject to reopening for good cause. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/4/2011. (sah, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. Defendants (sic) Brief And Motion To Dismiss Complaint in Intervention Under FRCP 12(b)(1)(2)(3)(6) and (7) 97 filed 06/14/2010, is GRANTED. The Motion To Sever Trustees Claims, Reinstate Trustees Claims to Trial Calendar, and Lift Stay of T rustees Claims, and Request for Expedited Consideration 102 filed 07/01/2010, is DENIED AS MOOT. The Complaint by Plaintiff in Intervention Janice A Steinle, Chapter 11 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of CCI Funding I, LLC 61 filed 03/29/2010, as well as all claims asserted therein, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Janice A Steinle, Esq., Chapter 11 Trustee for the bankruptcy estate of CCI Funding I, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, is DROPPED as a named party to this action. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/21/2010.(sah, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER. Defendants Summary Judgment Under Rule 56 on the Issues of Jurisdiction, Venue, and Propriety of Declaratory Relief Complaint Pursuant to12(b)(1)(2)(3)(6)/Motion To Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure,Memorandum, Statement of Uncont ested Facts, on Behalf of the Defendants 14 filed 10/05/2009, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants Brief and Motion To Dismiss Complaint in Intervention Under FRCP 12(B)(1)(2)(3)(6) & (7) 99 , filed 06/15/2010, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Thi s action is STAYED pending determination by the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico regarding which of these two parallel federal court actions should proceed. The Trial Preparation Conference, currently scheduled for 08/20/2 010, at 10:00 a.m., as well as the bench trial, currently scheduled tocommence on 08/23/2010, are VACATED and CONTINUED WITHOUT DATE, pending further order of the court. The parties SHALL FILE a status report with the court every sixty (60) days from the date of this order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/25/2010.(sah, )
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER : denying 64 Opposed Motion to Set Deadlines for Submission of Responsive Pleadings; granting 72 Opposed Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order and Case Management Order. Discovery due by 7/7/2010. Deadline for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure s: May 19, 2010 Discovery Cut-Off: July 7, 2010 Dispositive Motion Deadline: June 14, 2010 Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2010. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/5/10.(bnbcd, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Motion to Withdraw. attorney Kieth Van Doren is withdrawn from the representation of defendants DT Land Development, LLC, CV Land and Development Company, LLC, and Terry D. Corlis, and is to be removed from the electronic service, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/27/10.(bnbcd, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 43 the Motion to Intervene. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the Complaint By Plaintiff In Intervention Janice A. Steinle, Chapter 11 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of CCI Funding I, LLC, which is attached to the Motion to Intervene beginning at Page 13 of 22. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/29/2010.(sah, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. The Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order 47 filed on 03/08/2010 is GRANTED. The Motion for Protective Order 38 is DENIED as withdrawn. The hearing on the Motion for Protective Order set for 03/11/2010 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/09/2010.(sah, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/5/09. Five (5) day Bench Trial set for 8/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.(rebsec, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/20/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTLB AG, New York Branch v. DT Land Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTLB AG, New York Branch
Represented By: Tom McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT Land Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CV Land & Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry D. Corlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?