Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Pioneer Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Pioneer Farms, LLC, Feizhu Farms, LLC, Richard Carlson, H. Wayne Rice and Ronald Lynn Brock
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Richard Carlson, H. Wayne Rice and Pioneer Farms, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant: CB Land Company, LLC
Counter Claimant: Richard Carlson, H. Wayne Rice and Pioneer Farms, LLC
Counter Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Receiver: Alan E. Kessock
Case Number: 1:2009cv01937
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Baca
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT pursuant to the 82 Stipulation for Remand. This case is remanded to the District Court, Baca County, Colorado, where it was originally filed as case no. 2009cv6, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/12/10.(ebs, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 75 Unopposed Joint MOTION to Extend February 22, 2010 Deadlines. Dismissal Paper due by 3/12/2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/22/10. (ebs, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 50 MOTION to Withdraw and Written Notification Certificate. Arthur W. Porter is allowed to withdraw as counsel for CB Land Company, LLC. CB Land Company, LLC shall cause substitute counsel to enter an appearance by 2/1/2010. The p roposed scheduling order is refused. A revised scheduling order is due by 12/11/09. Supplemental scheduling conference set for 12/16/09 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/2/09. (ebs, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: granting 42 Unopposed Motion to Amend the caption, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/09.(bnbcd, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Ronald Lynn Brock. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted in this matter against Ronald Lynn Brock only are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/3/09.(ebs, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: re: Status Report due by 9/22/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall prepare a proposed scheduling order and submit it on or before October 1, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/1/09. (bnbcd, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/19/2009. (sah, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Walker D. Miller on 08/17/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Pioneer Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer May Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Farms, LLC
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feizhu Farms, LLC
Represented By: Sara E. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Carlson
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Wayne Rice
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lynn Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Richard Carlson
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: H. Wayne Rice
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Pioneer Farms, LLC
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: CB Land Company, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Woods Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Richard Carlson
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: H. Wayne Rice
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Pioneer Farms, LLC
Represented By: Donald Lydell Steerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer May Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Alan E. Kessock
Represented By: Michelle M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?