Williams v. Williams
Plaintiff: Allen M. Williams
Defendant: Clarence A. Williams
Case Number: 1:2009cv01938
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADMNISTRATIVELY CLOSING ACTION by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/8/2012. (ervsl, )
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before August 19, 2011, a Joint Status Report, not to exceed 4 pages in length, exclusive of signature blocks. Status Report due by 8/19/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/5/2011. (erv, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER denying 52 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Pre Trial [sic] Order of July 16, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/11.(mnf, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/9/11.(mnf, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Final Pre-Trial Order. Granting 40 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Enter and Appear Pro Se. Attorneys James W. Kim and Gary Steven Craw are withdrawn as counsel of record for the Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/21/10.(ebs, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Documents (Uncontested). Withdrawing 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/6/10.(ebs, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER striking 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1E, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/30/10.(ebs, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/25/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen M. Williams
Represented By: Gary Steven Craw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?