Sutch et al v. Badon
Plaintiff: Michelle Sutch and Sean Durkin
Defendant: Michael Badon
Case Number: 1:2009cv01952
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to pay his own costs and attorneys' fees by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/20/09. (jjh, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: denying as moot 8 Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Regarding their Confidential Information; denying as moot 29 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Their Consolidated Reply Memorandum in Response to the Defendant Michael Badon s and State Farms Responses to Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order. The parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a) on or before December 4, 2009, or a status report addressing why dismissal has not been accomplished. All future hearings set before Magistrate Judge Boland are vacated, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/09.(bnbcd, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2009. Taking under advisement 8 Motion for Protective Order; Granting 19 Motion to Intervene; (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 24 State Farms Motion to Vacate and RescheduleOctober 30, 2009 Hearing on State Farms Motion to Intervene (Doc. #19) and Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Regarding Their Confidential Information (Doc. #8). Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/09.(bnbcd, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/9/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutch et al v. Badon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sutch
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Durkin
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Badon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?