Kuhn v. Jordy Construction
Plaintiff: Ronald Richard Kuhn, II
Defendant: Jordy Construction
Case Number: 1:2009cv01973
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 32 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference is VACATED. The jury trial is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/24/2010. (sah, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion and Memorandum for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint. the Clerk of Court is directed to enter Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint located at Docket #20-2. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/25/2010. (mehcd)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/22/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/19/2010 at 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 12/6/2010 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebcd)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/19/2009. (sah, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Amended Complaint wihtin 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/09. (jjh, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a complaint on the proper court form, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/18/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhn v. Jordy Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Richard Kuhn, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordy Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?