Selectman v. Zavaras et al
Petitioner: Christopher Selectman
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv02006
Filed: August 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 30 Notice of Appeal by Christopher Selectman,appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court, by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/13/11. (bjrsl, )
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Christopher Selectman, and the civil action is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear his own costs and attorneys fees. It is FURTHER ORDERED that no certificate of appealability will issue because Petitioner Christopher Selectman has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c). by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/28/2011. (erv, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (mnf, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER For State Court Record. Respondent to provide state court record within 30 days. Clerk of this court to send copy of this Order to Clerk of the Criminal Court, Arapahoe County, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/14/10. (lyg, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Draw In Part and to Dismiss In Part. Claims One and Ten are dismissed for the reasons stated in this Order. Claims Two through Nine shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/23/2009. (sah, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the pre-answer response applicant may file a reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/27/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selectman v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Selectman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?