Baker v. Baxa Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Baker
Defendant: Baxa Corporation, Daryl Osborn, Jim Rendon and Luis Avila
Case Number: 1:2009cv02034
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission of Non-Party to Attend Settlement Conference. Plaintiff's husband, Tom Baker, may attend the Settlement Conference set for 03/21/2011 at 1:30 PM by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/14/2011.(wjc, )
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS: For the foregoing reasons, Baxa's Motion to Dismiss 17 is GRANTED, and Ms. Baker's independent "claims" for "respondeat superior" and "constructive discharge" are DISMISSED. However, these theories may be asserted in this action for other purposes. ENTERED BY: Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/11/11.(msksec, )
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/29/2010.(wjc, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/6/10. (msksec, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/2/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Baxa Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Baker
Represented By: David R. Struthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxa Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?