February 24, 2012 |
Filing
189
ORDER denying 182 Motion for Order for permission to appeal; denying 183 Motion for Order for retention of record; denying 184 Motion for Order for clerk to prepare record by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/24/12.(bjrsl, )
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
188
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 181 Notice of Appeal by Randal Ankeney, by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/16/12. (bjrsl, )
|
January 25, 2012 |
Filing
179
ORDER ADOPTED in their entirety 134 Report and Recommendations; Granting 83 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Compl aint; Denying 100 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Denying 104 Plaintiff's Motion for Reinstatement; Denying 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Delay Ruling on Magistrate Judges Recommendations; OVERRULED 157 , 160 , and 164 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/25/2012.(ervsl, )
|
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
160
MINUTE ORDER denying 158 plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Supplemental Discovery by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/16/2011.(ervsl, )
|
November 4, 2011 |
Filing
157
MINUTE ORDER denying 153 plaintiffs Motion to Compel Continuing Discovery by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2011.(ervsl, )
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
138
MINUTE ORDER granting 136 Defendants Motion to Vacate Final Pre-Trial and Settlement Conferences. It is thus further ORDERED that the Settlement Conference and Final Pretrial Conference set on July 19, 2011, at 2:30 p.m. are vacated. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/7/2011.(erv, )
|
June 30, 2011 |
Filing
135
MINUTE ORDER denying 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Costs by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/30/2011.(erv, )
|
April 12, 2011 |
Filing
123
MINUTE ORDER denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing/Conference; denying 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply up to and including April 25, 2011 ; granting 118 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply up to and including April 25, 2011 ; granting 119 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply up to and including April 25, 2011 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/12/2011.(erv, )
|
December 21, 2010 |
Filing
80
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2010. Denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Withdrawing 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Expert Witnesse s. Withdrawing 68 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Under F.R.C.P. [sic] 26(c). Denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Costs of Depositions. Granting 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing to Schedule Depositions. Withdrawing 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Transport Ankeney to Deposition. Withdrawing 75 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Issue Subpoena of Dr. Paula Frantz. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing
67
MINUTE ORDER denying 64 Plaintiffs Motion to Issue Subpoenas by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/24/2010.(erv, )
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
60
MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part 53 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, for Court-Appointed Expert, and For Extension of Time to Designate Plaintiff's Experts, as set forth in the minute order. Plaintiff shall not m ake multiple motions in one document as he did in Docket No. 53, otherwise the motion will be stricken. Denying 55 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, Interrogatories, and Requests for Admissions, as set forth in the minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/1/2010.(mjwcd)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER ACCEPTED AND ADOPTED 34 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Watanabe; Plaintiffs Objections to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 38 are OVERRULED; Denying 4 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Granting in part and Denying in part 26 Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/19/2010.(erv, )
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing
37
MINUTE ORDER granting in part 35 Plaintiff's "Judicial Notice of Incorrect Facts" which has been construed as a motion "that the Court allow him leeway in filing deadlines, particulary where he is a pro se party", by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2010.(mjwcd)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing
33
MINUTE ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Production of Medical Records, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/18/2010.(mjwcd)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
16
ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 10 Amended Complaint filed by Randal Ankeney by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/12/09. (erv, ) Modified on 11/23/2009 to correct the date signed(gmssl, ).
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing
13
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. The Complaint and action, as asserted against Steve Hartley, Tim Creany, Nurse Practitioner Klenke, Nurse Practioner Hibbs, Anthony A. DeCesaro and John Doe, sha ll be drawn to a district judge and a magistrate judge. Defendant Aristedes Zavaras is dismissed from the action, and the Clerk of the Court, is instructed to remove him as a named party to the suit. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/04/2009. (sah, )
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/09-. (jjh, )
|