September 29, 2011 |
Filing
107
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The Court GRANTS IN PART Iselo's Motion for Summary Judgment 105 , finding that Iselo is entitled to a judgment against Mr. Coonan in the amount of $585,000. The Clerk of the Court shall enter such judgment in favor of Iselo. Iselo shall have 21 days from the date of this Order within which to move for a default judgment against Innovative, failing which Iselo's claims against Innovative will be dismissed sua sponte for failure to prosecute and the case will be closed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/29/11.(msksec, )
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing
106
ORDER granting 97 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Defendant William Coonan shall pay to Plaintiff Iselo Holdings, LLC the sum of $12,482.89 in attorney's fees on or before 11/24/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2010.(mjwcd)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
104
MINUTE ORDER denying 101 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference and Stay Dispositive Motion Deadline as to staying the dispostive motion deadline, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/28/2010.(mjwcd)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
93
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Mr. Coonan's 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED in its entirety. Mr. Coonan's 90 Objections are OVERRULED, and the Court ADOPTS IN PART the 88 M agistrate Judge's Recommendation. Iselo's 83 Second Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED in lieu of the following sanctions imposed on Mr. Coonan. See Order for details. Mr. Coonan's 39 Counterclaim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Mr. Coonan's 29 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order which the Court has construed as a Motion to Stay pending determination of Mr. Coonan's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/10/2010.(wjc, )
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing
82
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2010. Granting 75 Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions Based on Defendants Failure to Comply with Court Order, or Alternative Mot ion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs Combine First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Defendant Coonan shall have to and including 5/28/2010 to answer the discovery requests. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
68
MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Its Combined First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Defendants shall submit their responses on or before 3/1/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/17/2010.(mjwcd )
|
December 14, 2009 |
Filing
55
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/09. (msksec, )
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing
52
OPINION AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. TheCourt will consider the Plaintiff's preliminary injunction motion in due course, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/11/2009.(wjc, )
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing
31
OPINION AND ORDER CONSTRUING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS A MOTION TO STAY. Defendants 29 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is CONSTRUED as a Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall file a response in accordance with the Local Rules. De fendants 30 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiffs 9 Motion to Strike Defendants Answer is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/20/2009.(wjc, )
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing
26
MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint for the reasons stated in the subject motion and in the interest of justice as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). The Amended Complaint (docket no. 10 -2) i s accepted for filing as of the date of this minute order. The Clerk of the Court shall file the tendered document located under docket no. 10 -2 into the CM/ECF Docket as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/10/2009.(wjc, )
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing
24
MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone; and granting 22 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/5/2009.(mjwcd )
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/3/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/05/2009. (wjc, )
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing
6
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/2/09. (mskcd)
|