March 28, 2012 |
Filing
167
Opinion and ORDER denying 157 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Under Red. R. Civ. P. 59(e), denying as moot 120 Defendant Scentoils.com's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 135 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Ju dgment. Clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendants Centric and Scentois and against plaintiff on all claims. Defendants to have their costs, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/28/12.(gmssl, ) Modified on 3/28/2012 to add the word "Opinion" to the title (gmssl, ).
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
138
ORDER finding as moot 133 Plaintiffs Motion for Waiver of Copy Fees; granting in part and denying in part 134 Plaintiffs Motion for Court Order to Have Copies of Motions Served Electronically or Certified Mail upon both Defendants at Court Expense. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/17/2011. (cbslc1)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
127
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that (1) Defendant Centric Group, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment 82 is GRANTED. Upon resolution of the remaining issues in the litigation, the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Centric and against Defendant on all claims. (2) Plaintiff Thomas Howell's Motion for Summary Judgment 83 is DENIED. (3) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend his Motion for Summary Judgment 90 is GRANTED. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/27/11.(msksec, )
|
August 5, 2011 |
Filing
122
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2011 denying as moot 116 Motion to Compel; granting 121 Motion for Extension of Time. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
April 25, 2011 |
Filing
115
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/25/11. (msksec, )
|
August 17, 2010 |
Filing
79
ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, doc # 73 is DENIED as unnecessary and moot; the Motion for Service of Summons and Complaint, doc # 74 is DENIED as unnecessary and moot; the Motion for Waiver of Service of Process Fees, doc # 75 is DENIED as unnecessary and moot by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/17/2010.(cbscd)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
72
COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Status Conference was held on 8/4/2010. ORDERED: The Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, doc # 56 is GRANTED. An Amended Complaint shall b e filed on or before AUGUST 11, 2010; Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment, doc # 59 is DENIED AS MOOT; Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery, doc # 60 is DENIED. By 5:00 p.m. on Friday, AUGUST 6, 20 10, Centric Group is REQUIRED to produce to Mr. Howell the MSDS sheet that he is asking for, or a statement explaining the circumstances under which Centric Group does not have the MSDS sheet. Centric Group shall produce a copy of the insurance poli cy as soon as the certified copy is available; The Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, doc # 66 , is GRANTED. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to SEPTEMBER 4, 2010. The c ourt will not extend this deadline any further; Centric's oral motion to withdraw, without prejudice, the Motion for Summary Judgment, doc # 18 , and the Amended Motion for Summary Judgment, doc # 21 is GRANTED and doc # 18 , and doc # 21 are deemed WITHDRAWN WITH LEAVE TO REFILE on or before SEPTEMBER 4, 2010; Plaintiff's Request for Court to Rule on the MSDS's Admissibility and That the MSDS's Be an Exception to the Hearsay Rule and Be Considered as Business Records, doc # 67 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2010. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing
48
COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Status Conference was held on 4/21/2010. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Compel, # 36 is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiff's Motion for Time to Complete Discovery, # 43 is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Obtain Written Depositions, # 44 is DENIED AS MOOT; Defendant's Motion to Take Deposition, # 31 is GRANTED; Defendant's Motion for Time to Co nduct Discovery, # 32 is DENIED AS MOOT; Defendant is required to respond to Interrogatory #6; Plaintiff is allowed to serve 10 Requests for Production; Plaintiff may file a Motion for Summary Judgment by JULY 19, 2010. Discovery due by JUNE 7, 2010. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Per the court's request, the courtroom deputy mailed a copy of Judge Krieger's Practice Standards along with these Minutes to the Plaintiff. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/26/09. (mskcd)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER DRAWING CASES. Ordered that this case be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/01/2009. (sah, )
|