Pfizer Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Pfizer Limited and C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V.
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02392
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Plaintiff's Motion Transfer or to Stay this action to the extent it seeks a transfer to the District of Delaware and DENIED to the extent that it seeks a stay, as the stay request is now moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT this action be transferred to the District of Delaware for further prosecution and adjudication. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/8/2010.(erv, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/4/2010. (erv, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 11 Joint Stipulation to Strike Sandoz Jury Demand and Request for a Nonjury Trial. The jury demand made by Defendant Sandoz Inc. in its Answer and Counterclaims for Declaratory Relief 6 is STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, to renew should a new issue triable by jury be added to the case. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/12/09.(erv, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/16/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Diane Jennifer Hellwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Diane Jennifer Hellwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Diane Jennifer Hellwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Limited
Represented By: Diane Jennifer Hellwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V.
Represented By: Diane Jennifer Hellwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?