Spelke v. HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Spelke
Defendant: HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC, HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Atlas/International Citizen Group Insurance Trust Hamilton, Bermuda
Case Number: 1:2009cv02399
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/26/2010. (erv, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 16 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLCs Written Discovery Responses. The defendant shall make supplemental discovery responses and produce additional documents (if any) consistent with this Order and in full compliance with the formalities of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before March 26, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/19/10.(bnbcd, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/20/09. (bnbcd, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The parties' Stipulation for Dismissal and Modification of Case Caption is GRANTED. Defendants HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. and Atlas/International Citizen Group Insurance Trust Hamilton Bermuda are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/14/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spelke v. HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Spelke
Represented By: Joshua Robert Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Robin E. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robin E. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Robin E. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas/International Citizen Group Insurance Trust Hamilton, Bermuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?