Pritchett v. I-Flow Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joel M. Pritchett
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca LP, Zeneca Holdings, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Abbott Laboratories and Eastman Kodak Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02433
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 91 , is DENIED; This case shall proceed to trial on the following claims: (1) negligence; (2) strict liabilityfailure to warn; (3) fraud; and (4) negligent misrepresentation; and All other claims are abandoned by Plaintiff, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/18/2012.(ervsl, )
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 106 Defendant I-Flow Corporations Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Dr. Jon Hyman Under Fed. R. Evid. 702, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/17/2012.(ervsl, )
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 89 The Motion of Defendant I-Flow Corporation to Exclude Dr. Suzanne Parisian, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/28/2011.(ervsl, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ENTRY for Evidentiary Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/10/2012; taking under advisement 89 Motion to Exclude and 106 Motion to Exclude. The Court will issue a written order on these matters, in due course. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting in part 116 Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Evidentiary Hearing. Evidentiary Hearing RESET for 1/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix the parties shall submit a joint pre-hearing Status Report due by 1/5/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for January 10, 2012, is VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/2011.(ervsl, )
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before August 19, 2011, a Joint Status Report, not to exceed 4 pages in length, exclusive of signature blocks. Status Report due by 8/19/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/5/2011. (erv, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Defendant I-Flow Corporations Unopposed Motion to Lift StayThe stay of proceedings in this case is lifted. by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/3/2010.(erv, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 47 Defendant I-Flow Corporation's Motion to Temporarily Stay All Proceedings. The case is stayed until such time as the MDL Panel issues an order on the pending Motion to Transfer. Production of Plaintiff's medical records shall continue during this stay of proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/22/10.(ebs, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 42 Motion to Dismiss and 49 Motion to Dismiss, pursuant to the Notices of Dismissal 52 and 53 , by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/17/10.(ebs, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/15/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchett v. I-Flow Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel M. Pritchett
Represented By: Seth Alan Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeneca Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?