J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Stott et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: David (I) Stott, David Stott, Tom (I) Anderson, Tom Anderson and Stottgracey LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02447
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 47:0553 Cable Comm: Unauthorized Reception of Cable Services
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. Each party to pay his or its own costs, attorneys fees, and expenses. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/15/11.(jjpsl, )
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/9/2010. (erv, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: 20 Notice filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs Counsels letter dated February 4, 2010, which the Court deems to be a motion (the Motion). The purpose of the Motion is to seek the Courts sig nature on a subpoena duces tecum to non-party DISH Network, LLC. First, it is not appropriate for counsel to communicate with the Court by letter, except in the context of settlement negotiations. The Court ordinarily does not, and will not in the fu ture, respond to letters from counsel. Second, as set forth in Fed.R.Civ.P. 45(a)(3), a subpoena duces tecum must be completed by a party and either issued by the clerk of the court for the district where the production is to be made, or by an attorn ey as an officer of that court, so long as s/he is authorized to practice therein. Accordingly, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, United States Magistrate Judges dont sign subpoenas. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/10/2010. (erv, )
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Purported 10 Answer to Complaint of Defendant Stottgracey LLC. The answer is stricken, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/25/09.(gmssl, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Dismissal of Party filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc., Tom Anderson and Tom (I) Anderson DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff and Defendant Anderson to pay his or its own costs, attorneys fees and expenses. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/6/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Stott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom (I) Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stottgracey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?