Erickson v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Pamela Erickson
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv02534
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/17/10. (jjh, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed 25 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The deadline for defendants Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures is 10/27/10. The deadline for plaintiffs rebuttal expert disclosures is 11/11/10. Discovery due by 12/20/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2011 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/09/10.(jjh, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/30/2010 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 22, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/3/2010. (rpmcd)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Modifying Rule 16 Procedure - ERISA. A joint statement addressing the matters set for in the order is due 3/24/10, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/22/10. (gmssl, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Amend Complaint and the Amended Complaint attached thereto is accepted for filing, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/8/2010.(rpmcd)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER MODIFYING RULE 16 PROCEDURE - ERISA Joint Statement due by 1/22/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/15/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Erickson
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?