Jacquat v. Hub International Insurance Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Jacquat
Defendant: Hub International Insurance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02539
Filed: October 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING 138 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice the claims and counterclaims between the parties in this matter, WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. Denying as moot 68 Defendant Hub International Insurance Services, Inc.s Motion for Sanctions; Set Aside as moot 133 Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabes Report and Recommendations.; by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/8/2010.(erv, )
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 135 Motion to Stay all Pending Deadlines, Orders and settings in this matter are Vacated, Stayed, or otherwise held in Abeyance pending the submission of a Stipulation of Dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper due by 11/5/2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/25/2010.(erv, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 68 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Hub International Insurance Services, Inc., BE GRANTED; and ORDER GRANTING 109 MOTION to Compel Responses to Second Set of Discovery Requests filed by Hub International Insurance Services, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/7/2010. (erv, )
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER denying 86 Non-Party Motion of Jeffrey Cohen to QuashSubpoena to Take Deposition by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/23/2010.(erv, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER OVERRULING 66 Defendants Rule 72(a) Objections to Magistrate [Judges] Order on Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Watanabes Order of July 20, 2010 is AFFIRMED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/22/2010. (erv, )
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER granting 91 plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibit to Response to Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; granting 100 Jeffrey Cohens Motion for Reconsideration of Jeffrey Cohen to Quash Subpoena to Take Deposition. The court thus vacates its Minute Order of August 18, 2010 88 , denying the Motion of Jeffrey Cohen to Quash Subpoena 86 without prejudice. Any responses to the Motion of Jeffrey Cohen to Quash Subpoena 86 , shall be filed on or before September 13, 2010. ; granting 105 defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave Exceed Page Limitation for Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions up to and including fifteen pages in length. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/30/2010.(erv, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Consequently, plaintiff's Response to Motion for Sanctions 90 is accepted as filed, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/26/2010.(mjwcd)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 83 Stipulated Fourth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 21 . Within 5 days of Chief Judge Daniel's ruling on Defendant's Objection 74 , Plaintiff shall file a status report stating the dates certain of the Discovery Cut-Off, Completion of Depositions, and Dispositive Motions Deadlines in light of the extensions set forth in this Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/18/2010.(mjwcd)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 65 Defendant's Motion for Stay; granting 69 Motion to Seal Exhibit to Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; granting 75 Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference vacated and reset for 11/1/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe and proposed Final Pretrial Order due on or before 10/26/10, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/9/10.(lyg, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER Denying 52 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2010.(mjwcd)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 29 Plaintiffs Motion for a Determination of Questions of Law, and Colorado law will apply to all claims and the Non-SolicitationAgreement. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/15/2010.(erv, )
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Stipulated Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 21 . Discovery due by 7/16/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/26/2010.(mjwcd)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/25/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/4/2010.(mjwcd)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/16/2010. (mjwcd )
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Settlement Conference set 3/8/2010 09:00 AM is vacated. Settlement Conference reset for 3/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2010.(mjwcd )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/20/2010. (mjwcd)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacquat v. Hub International Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jacquat
Represented By: Barry Alan Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub International Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?