February 28, 2011 |
Filing
152
ORDER. The January 6, 2011 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe 141 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. Plaintiffs Objections to the Magistrate Judges January 6, 2011 144 and 148 are OVERRULED. Defendants Wilner, Cink, Re ichert, and Milusnics Motion to Dismiss 77 is GRANTED. Defendants Cink and Reicherts Motion for Summary Judgment 89 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Wilner, Cink, Reichert, Milusnic, and Greenwood are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Cink and Reichert are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 149 is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/28/2011.(sah, )
|
January 11, 2011 |
Filing
143
ORDER. The 139 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Plaintiff's 130 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/11/11.(mnf, )
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing
139
RECOMMENDATION on Plaintiff's 130 MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order. That the Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order be denied, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/29/10. (mnf, )
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing
135
ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 7 Amended Complaint filed by Jerry Lewis Dedrick by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Service of Process form for B. Greenwood)(erv, )
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing
132
ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED 122 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. denying 114 Plaintiffs Motion for An [sic] Court Order Compelling Co-Defendant, L. Milusnic, A.W. to Stop Retaliation Against Plaintiff by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/23/2010.(erv, )
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
122
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 114 Plaintiffs Motion for an [sic] Court Order Compelling Co-Defendant, L. Milusnic, A.W. to Stop Retaliation Against Plaintiff, be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/8/2010. (erv, )
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
110
MINUTE ORDER granting 107 Dfefendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment ; STRIKING 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/14/2010.(erv, )
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
97
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 78 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel productions of Defendants Personnel File; denying without prejudice 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena; granting 93 Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery; denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Hearing. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/25/2010.(erv, )
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing
69
ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 59 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Denying 38 Plaintiff's Request for Immediate Help; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/21/2010.(erv, )
|
April 23, 2010 |
Filing
50
MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Plaintiff's Notice of Consideration to the extent that the exhibits submitted will be considered when it review plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/23/10.(gms, )
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
45
MINUTE ORDER: Denying as moot 39 plaintiff's "Notice" Motion for Service on the Defendants. Denying as premature 42 plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/20/2010.(mjwcd)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
30
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. The 12/15/2009 Order to Show Cause is discharged. Defendant Bureau of Prisions is dismissed from the action. The Clerk of Court shall remove Defendant Bureau of Prisons from the docketing record as a party to this action. The claims asserted against Defendants J.M. Wilner, B. Greenwood, B. Cink, Mrs. Reichert, and L. Milusnic shall be assigned to District Judge Christine M. Arguello, pursuant to D.C.COLO. LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Mr. Dedrick's Motion for an Order to Enforce a Common Law Lien 20 filed on 01/05/2010 is DENIED. Mr. Dedrick's Request for United States Marshal's Summons 27 is DENIED as unnecessary. Mr. Dedrick's Motion for Court Order Compelling Production of Defendant's Personnel File 28 is DENIED as inappropriate. By Judge Christine M. Arguello for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/25/2010.(sah, )
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
21
Minute ORDER Plaintiffs request to serve summons 17 and motion to subpoena witnesses 19 , are DENIED as premature. Plaintiffs motion to amend a defendant 13 , is DENIED as unnecessary and inappropriate by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/08/10.(jjh, ) Modified on 1/11/2010 to correct spelling error (jjh, ).
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing
1
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action, Construing Habeas Corpus Action as a Bivens Action, and Instructing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a complaint and 1915 motion on the proper court forms, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/09. (jak, )
|