Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mantria Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Mantria Corporation, Troy B. Wragg, Amanda E. Knorr, Speed of Wealth, LLC, Wayde M. McKelvy and Donna M. McKelvy
Case Number: 1:2009cv02676
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER Granting In Part Receiver's Motion to Approve Distribution Plan. The Receiver's Motion to Approve Receiver's Report, Proposed Distribution Plan,and Proposed Allocation Percentages and Distribution Procedures (Doc. # 669 ) is GRA NTED IN PART and MODIFIED IN PART as reflected in this Order; on or before August 7, 2020, the Receiver shall submit a revised proposed orderthat reflects the modifications the Court has detailed; and the hearing that is currently set for July 8, 2020, is VACATED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/06/2020. (rvill, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting 490 Motion for Order. Community Banks is directed turnover all funds presently in Donna McKelvy's frozen account (ending 4832) to the Commission in connection with the above- captioned action as indicated in the attached Order. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/10/2016. (athom, )
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting 470 Application for Approval of Payment of Receiver's Fees and Expenses for the Period from April 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/07/15.(jhawk, )
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER Granting Receiver's 464 Motion to Approve Sale of Real Property Near the City of Dunlap, Tennessee. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/28/2015. (athom, )
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting 454 Motion for Order: Order Approving Payment of Receiver's Fees and Expenses for the Period January 1, 2015, Through March 31, 2015, Subject to a Twenty Percent Holdback. It is FURTHER ORDERED that in future fee applications, counsel shall provide the Court with the amounts the Receiver requests after the 20% holdback is accounted for. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/29/2015. (athom, )
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting 428 Motion for Order: Order Approving Payment of Receiver's Fees and Expenses for the Period July 1, 2014 Through September 30, 2014, Subject to a Twenty Percent Holdback. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/02/2014. (athom, )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting 417 Motion for Order: Order Approving Payment of Receiver's Fees and Expenses for the Period April 1, 2014 Through June 30, 2014, Subject to a Twenty Percent Holdback. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/09/2014.(athom, )
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 400 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 397 Order. By Clerk on 07/21/2014. (athom, )
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 397 FINAL ORDER Granting Approval of Class Action Settlements, Awards of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, Class Representatives' Incentive Awards and Dismissal With Prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/18/2014. (athom, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting with modifications 348 Receiver's Twelfth Application for Approval of Payment of Receiver's Fees and Expenses by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/30/13.(dkals, )
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting with modifications 329 Tenth Application for Approval of Payment of Receivers Fees and Expenses for the Period October 1, 2012, through December 31, 2012 by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/22/13.(dkals, )
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER Approving with modifications 301 Application for Approval of Payment of Receivers Fees and Expenses by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/16/12.(dkals, ) Modified on 10/17/2012 to correct the file date (cmacd).
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER to Administratively Close Case by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/26/12. (dkals, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting 256 Motion for Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/30/12.(dkals, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER denying 270 Motion to Stay Pending Outcome of Receiver and Investor Lawsuits and Grand Jury Investigation. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/25/12.(cmacd )
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting 278 Motion for Order Approving Payment of Receiver's Fees 1/1/12 - 3/31/12 by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/23/12.(cmacd )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF RECEIVER'S FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE PERIOD JULY 1, 2011, THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2011, SUBJECT TO A TWENTY PERCENT HOLDBACK granting 243 Motion for Order. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/13/11.(jjpsl, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 234 Unopposed Motion to Partially Lift Stay for Receivership Claims Against Astor Weiss Kaplan & Mandel, LLP, Tatum, LLC, a division of SFN Group, Inc., Christopher P. Flannery, Daniel J. Rink, Krassenstein & Unger, LLC, and Steven L . Granoff. The Stay is lifted for the limited purpose of the Receiver pursuing his Complaint against the Gatekeepers, as attached to the Motion. The Stay remains in full force and effect as to any other claims or third parties. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/17/11.(mnfsl, )
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Modifying the Order re: 82 Order Appointing Receiver, NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: Paragraph 31 of the Courts Order Appointing Receiver 82 is modified as follows: As set forth in detail below, the followin g proceedings, excluding the instant proceeding and all police or regulatory actions and actions of the Commission related to the above- captioned enforcement action, are stayed until further Order of this Court: All civil legal proceedings of any na ture, including, but not limited to, bankruptcy proceedings, arbitration proceedings, foreclosure actions, default proceedings, or other actions of any nature involving: (a) the Receiver, in his capacity as Receiver; (b) any Receivership Property, wh erever located; or (c) any of the Receivership Defendants, including subsidiaries and partnerships; whether as plaintiff, defendant, third-party plaintiff, third- party defendant, or otherwise (such proceedings are hereinafter referred to as Ancillary Proceedings). Accordingly, IT IS SO ORDERED, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/20/2011. (erv, )
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting 159 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment against Mantria. Plaintiff is directed to submit, within 14 days of this Order, a proposed Order of Permanent Injunction against Mantria that conforms to the substance of this Order; T he Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action for all purposes in connection with this matter, including implementation and enforcement of the terms of this Order and to grant such relief as the Court may deem necessary and just. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/5/2011.(erv, )
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 195 The Receivers Fourth Application for Approval of Payment of Receivers Fees and Expenses for the Period from January 1, 2011 through March 31, 2011 by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/24/2011.(erv, )
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 192 Receivers Motion to Approve Sale of Real Property to the City of Carlsbad. It is hereby ORDERED that the Receiver is authorized to sell the Property, described as: Unit 1, Block 3, Lots 6 through 16, inclusive, Carlsbad Airport I ndustrial Park, Carlsbad, Eddy County, New Mexico, as shown on the official plat thereof on file in the office of the County Clerk of Eddy County, New Mexico, and containing approximately 7.492 acres, to the City of Carlsbad for the sum of $44,952.00. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/4/2011.(erv, )
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Wayde M. McKelvy by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/5/2011. (ervsl, )
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 179 Motion for Permanent Injunction as to Amanda Knorr by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/29/2011.(erv, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER granting 175 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Fourth Request) Due to Settlement Agreements Reached with All Individual Defendants and Pending Resolution of Case Without Trial. Final Pretrial Conference 3/29/2011 09:00 AM is vacated, Scheduling Order 71 is amended accordingly. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/22/2011.(mjwcd)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER denying 168 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Third Request), by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/7/2011.(mjwcd)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 127 Receivers Second Application for Approval of Payment [July 1, 2010 September 30, 2010] by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/1/2011.(erv, )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER granting 139 Motion to Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Second Request]. Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2011. Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 3/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2010.(erv, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Order on the Receivers First Application for Approval of Payment April 20 - June 30, 2010, and Receivers Supplement to September 7, 2010 Motion for Order 122 , for approval of payment of Receivers fees in the amount o f $83,302.00 and expenses in the amount of $5,157.88 for the period April 30, 2010 through June 30, 2010. It is ORDERED that the Receiver be paid a total amount of $88,459.88 for his fees and expenses incurred for the period April 30, 2010 through June 30, 2010, from funds in the Receivership estate. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/12/2010.(erv, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (First Request). Scheduling Order 71 is amended at paragraphs 8a and 8b. Discovery due by 11/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 12/29/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/26/2010.(mjwcd)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 89 Interested Party W.R. Love, Inc.s Petition for Release of Frozen Assets ; and W.R. Love, Inc. shall not file any further documents with this Court without representation of counsel. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/24/2010.(erv, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting 84 Unopposed Motion to Continue Settlement Conference; Settlement Conference Reset for 7/16/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/2010.(erv, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Vacate Show Cause Hearing On Contempt. Upon review of the motion, the Court finds that good cause exists to vacate the hearing based on Defendant Wayde McKelvy having substantially complied wi th the SECs requirements and the SECs belief that contempt sanctions are no longer needed to enforce compliance with the Courts orders. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the show cause hearing currently scheduled for February 12, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/10/2010.(erv, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Permanent Injunction against Donna M. McKelvy by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/16/09.(erv, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/14/2009. (mjwcd )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS re: 25 Order on Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/3/09. (erv, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for Preliminary Injunction, Asset Freeze, and Other Equitable Relief. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the SECs Motion for A Preliminary Injunction is granted as to defendants Mantria Corporation, Troy B. Wragg, Amanda E. Knorr, Speed of Wealth, LLC, Wayde M. McKelvy, and Donna M. McKelvy. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/2/09. (erv, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants, and each of them, shall appear before this Court at 3:30 p.m. on Friday, November 20, 2009 in Courtroom A602 of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, to show cause, if a ny there be, why this Court should not enter a Preliminary Injunction and order preliminary relief against the defendants pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and extend the temporary relief granted in this Order until a final adjudication on the merits may be had. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/16/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mantria Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Julie K. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantria Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy B. Wragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda E. Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speed of Wealth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayde M. McKelvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M. McKelvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?