Riddle et al v. Daley
Plaintiff: |
Joelle Riddle, Carol Blatnick, Wayne Buck and Mandy Mikulencak |
Defendant: |
Linda Daley |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv02680 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
La Plata |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 23, 2010 |
Filing
63
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANTS ON THE MERITS. Based on the parties's stipulated facts and the briefing herein, the Court finds that the Defendants are entitled to judgment in their favor on the merits of this action. Judgment to that effect shall enter contemporaneously with this Order. The motions at Docket # 12 , 13 , 31 , 32 , 37 , and 39 are DENIED as moot, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/23/2010.(wjc, )
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
22
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/9/10. (msksec, )
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 2/9/2010 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402. Effective December 1, 2009, the court modified the standard scheduling order and added a specialized scheduling order for administrative record review matters. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order that complies with the Local Rules in effect after December 1, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/10/09.(cbssec)
|
November 27, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/27/09. (mskcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?