Moore v. Medina
Petitioner: Joshua D. Moore
Respondent: Angel Medina
Case Number: 1:2009cv02698
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Alter Judgment (Motion to Reconsider). Ordered that the habeas corpus application is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust state remedies as set forth in the 01/21/10 Order of Dismissal, and as supplemented in this Order by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/16/10.(jjh, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Respondent to file a response to the 7 MOTION to Amend/Alter Order of Judgment and Dismissal 6 Clerk's Judgment within 21 days, the Applicant may file a reply within 21 days of filing of the response, by Judge Christine M. Arguello for Senior Judge Zita Leeson Weinshienk on 2/18/10. (gmssl, ) Modified on 2/22/2010 to add text re: filing the reply. (gmssl, ).
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the habeas corpus application is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust state remedies. Ordered that no certificate of appealability will issue because Applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/20/10. (jjh, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Ordered that within 20 days the Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Preliminary Reponse Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/19/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angel Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?