Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition et al v. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. et al
Plaintiff: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition, Anita Hansen, Robert Sirowitz, Joshua Stapen and Robin Stephens
Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc. and J.M. Hollister LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02757
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 260 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement and Awarding attorneys' Fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/29/2015. (evana, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: In Court Hearing held on 9/24/2015. Granting 260 Motion to Certify Class. ORDERED: Counsel for Plaintiffs shall confer with counsel for Defendants and submit a form of order not later than Wednesday, September 30, 2015. Court Reporter: Mary George. (rkeec)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER re: 246 Agreed Stipulation Staying Execution Pending Dsipositon of Defendants' Appeal, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/11/2014. (evana, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 231 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Julie Farrar, Anita Hansen, Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition. Pursuant to the ADA, 42 U.S.C. § 12205, Plaintiffs are awarded attorney fees in the amou nt of $370,352.57 and costs in the amount of $20,342.51. It is FURTHER ORDERED that based on the parties Joint Statement Re: Additional Attorneys Fees for the Period August 31, 2013 to Present ECF No. 244 , I add $14,500 to the amount ordered above, for a total award of $384,852.57 in attorney fees and costs in the amount of $20,342.51, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/26/2014. (evana, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE ORDER striking 240 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 1/6/2014 to correct linkage (jjhsl, ).
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying 217 Motion to Stay Injunctive Relief Pending Appeal by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/15/13.(jjhsl, )
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 PERMANENT INJUNCTION and Administrative Closure of Case by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/20/13. (jjhsl, ) Modified on 8/20/2013 to correct title (jjhsl, ).
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs= Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief and Request for Clarification of Hearing with Alternative Request for Discovery 206 is GRANTED to the extent that I will accept Plaintiffs Reply Brief for filing. All other requests are DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/30/13.(jjhsl, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Entry of Injunction, and Entry of Judgment, filed April 27, 2012 162 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, To Vacate August 31, 2011 Ord er 164 is DENIED. ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer before March 15, 2013, to attempt to craft an injunction/remedy that is mutually agreeable to both parties. If the parties can reach agreement on the contents of a proposed injunc tion, they shall jointly file the proposed injunction not later than April 19, 2013. If the parties are not able to reach agreement, Plaintiffs shall file a proposed injunction and Defendants shall have 15 days to respond by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/07/13. (jjhsl, )
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Courtroom Minutes for Motion for Summary Judgment 162 and 164 held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel held on 1/24/2013. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Injunction and Entry of Judgment 162 , is GRANTED. ORDERE D: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Vacate August 31, 2011 Order 164 , is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a proposed order addressing both ECF Doc. Nos. 162 and 164 with the Court not later than Friday, February 8, 2013. ORDERED that within 45 days of today's date, the parties shall meet and confer to determine if they can resolve this case with a settlement or reach an agreement on the remedy/remedies subject to the Defendants maintaining whatever legal rights they choose to maintain Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (jjhsl, )
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER granting 182 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Two-Page Reply Brief. Plaintiff may file the reply brief attached to their motion, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/26/12.(gmssl, )
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER This matter is before the court on Stipulated Modifation (sic) of Discovery Stay; the Stipulated Modifation (sic) of Discovery Stay Doc. No. 166 , is DENIED. There is no stay as to which such a modification may be directed, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' various objections to certification are denied, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 125 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Anita Hansen and Julie Farrar are hereby certified as representatives of a nationwide class of individuals seeking injunctive relief, as defined on page 2 of the Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/20/12. (jjhsl, )
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Granting 125 Motion to Certify Class; Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2012. Written order shall follow. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/8/2011. Granting 123 Motion for Leave. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint currently attached as Exhibit 1 to plaintiffs motion 123. Granting 139 Motion to Withdraw. (FTR: B. Abiakam) (babia)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. Order granting 126 Motion to Compel Named Plaintiff Joshua Stapen's Deposition. Joshua Stapen will appear and have his deposition taken, upon service of proper and timely notice by the Defendants. The deposition will be taken on or before December 13, 2011 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/22/11.(jjh, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended and Class Action Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Fourth Amended and Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 113-1), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/23/11.(lsw, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Respond to the Statement of Interest 101 is GRANTED and their responsive brief is accepted for filing. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 87 , is GRANTED. Therefore the center front entrances at the Hollister stores at Park Meadows mall and Orchard Town Center mall violate Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/31/11.(jjh, )
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re: Briefing Schedule. See Order for Details by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/21/11. (jjh, )
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SECOND AMENDED ORDER. Ordered that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing 76 is Denied by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/02/11. (jjh, )
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED ORDER re: 94 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/18/11. (jjh, )
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/31/10. (wydcd, rrk)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 61 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Discovery and the deadlines set in Scheduling Order are stayed pending ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/9/10.(lyg, )
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/17/2010. (erv, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 43 Joint Motion for for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/2010.(erv, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 24 Plaintiffs Motion for leave to file Second Amended and Class Action Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/12/2010.(erv, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint(Doc. No. 18-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/25/2010.(kmtcd, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The Court will permit the appearances of Mr. Thomas Ridgley and Mr. Miller by telephone at the Settlement Conference set for March 18, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/18/2010. (kmtcd, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/10/09. (kmtcd)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/9/09. (kmtcd)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/02/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition et al v. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hansen
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sirowitz
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Stapen
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Stephens
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Hollister LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?