Vigil v. Walters et al
Plaintiff: Terry Vigil
Defendant: Polly Walters, Karlin Werner, Jere Sutton and Louis Cabling
Case Number: 1:2009cv02886
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. Plaintiff's 91 Petition for Panel Rehearing which the Court construes as a motion to alter or amend judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e), is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/10/11.(mnfsl, )
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 94 Notice of Appeal by Terry Vigil, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/03/11. (bjrsl, )
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER accepting 86 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The 58 , 59 Motions for Summary Judgment are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/10/11.(mnf, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Plaintiff's "Request to Obtain a Document I Signed Via Fraud," to the extent the document is construed as a motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/8/2011. (mehcd)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, and granting in part and denying in part 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time. Status Conference set for 12/22/2010 is vacated. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/17/2010. (mehcd)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendant Jere Sutton's Motion to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Terry Vigil, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2010. (mehcd)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Plaintiffs Motion for Court Order for Twenty Percent to be Taken Directly from Plaintiffs Inmate Account. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/27/2010.(sah, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/11/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. Walters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karlin Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jere Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Cabling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?