Iowa Pacific Holdings, LLC v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Iowa Pacific Holdings, LLC
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv02977
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER. Defendants Motion To Alter or Amend Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial on Damages 179 filed 8/10/2011, is DENIED.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/14/2012. (sah, )
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. The claim for promissory estoppel of the plaintiff, Iowa Pacific Holdings, LLC, is RESOLVED against the plaintiff and in favor of the defendant, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. The partial Final Judgment 177 filed 7/13/2011, is SU PPLEMENTED to provide that judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of the defendant, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, against the plaintiff, Iowa Pacific Holdings, LLC, on its claim for promissory estoppel, which claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/16/2011.(sah, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Stipulation and ORDER regarding custody of trial exhibits by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/7/11. (rebcd)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion For Extension of Orders To Bring iPhones, Blackberrys and Computers Into The Courtroom and For Leave To Bring an Additional Computer Into Courtroom 168 filed 7/5/2011, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Extension of Orders Granting Leave To Bring Blackberries and Computers Into The Courtroom 170 filed 7/5/2011, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/6/2011.(sah, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Leave To Bring Laptop Computer Into The Courtroom 163 filed 6/28/2011, is GRANTED. Mr. Marko, who is permitted by this order to enter the courthouse with electronic equipment SHALL PRESENT a copy of this order to the Court Security Officers stationed at the entrance of the courthouse. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/29/2011.(sah, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion For Leave To Bring iPhone and Blackberry Into The Courtroom 160 filed 6/27/2011, is GRANTED. That Mr. Corl, who is permitted by this order to enter the courthouse with electronic equipment SHALL PRESENT a copy of this order to the Court Security Officers stationed at the entrance of the courthouse. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/28/2011.(sah, )
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Leave To Bring Blackberry IntoThe Courtroom 157 filed 6/23/2011, is GRANTED. Mr. Smeltzer, who is permitted by this order to enter the courthouse with electronic equipment, SHALL PRESENT a copy of this order to the Court Security Officers stationed at the entrance of the courthouse. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2011.(sah, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion For Leave To Bring IPhone Into The Courtroom 155 filed Ju6/22/2011, is GRANTED. Ms. Catt, who is permitted by this order to enter the courthouse with electronic equipment SHALL PRESENT a copy of this order to the Court Security Officers stationed at the entrance of the courthouse. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/22/2011.(sah, )
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying Defendant Amtrack's Renewed 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claim for Breach of Oral Contract, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/10/11.(lsw, )
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 128 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Bring Audio, Video and Computer Equipment Into the Courtroom, as set forth in the order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/31/11.(gmssl, )
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer 25 to Withdraw Certain Affirmative Defenses 123 is GRANTED. Defendants Answer 25 is deemed to be amended to withdraw affirmative defenses numbers 1, 2, 4, 5, 7-14. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/2011.(sah, )
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER. The parties Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 102 is GRANTED. The nonexpert discovery deadline is extended to 4/19/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/7/2011.(sah, )
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 96 Emergency Motion To Modify Third Trial Preparation Conference Order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/15/11.(lsw, )
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Minute ORDER denying 94 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/14/11.(lsw, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER. The parties Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 86 is GRANTED. The nonexpert discovery deadline to no later than 4/8/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/1/2011.(sah, )
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER. IPHs Motion for Denial of Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) 39 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/2011.(sah, )
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Breach of Oral Contract, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/14/11.(mnf, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 THIRD TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five (5) Day Jury Trial set for 6/27/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/10/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/15/10. (mnf, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Agreed Motion for Entry of Modified Scheduling Order 70 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Expert Disclosure Deadline 01/11/2011; Nonexpert Discovery Deadline 01/25/2011; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline 02/09/2011; Expert Discovery Deadline 02/25/2011; Dispositive Motions Deadline 03/11/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/08/2010 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated and RESET to 03/30/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in CourtroomC-204. The parties shall submit their proposed final pretrial order no later than 03/23/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/27/2010.(sah, )
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/31/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/22/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 5/9/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Dugan Bliss 62 is GRANTED. Dugan Bliss is relieved of any further representation of Defendant in the above-captioned matter. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/30/2010.(sah, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Modify Scheduling Order [sic] for Extension of Trial Dates 59 , filed 08/16/2010, is GRANTED. the Trial Preparation Conference scheduled for 11/19/2010, at 11:00 a.m., as well as the trial, currently scheduled to commence on 12/06/2010, are VACATED and CONTINUED. A telephonic setting conference is SET for 08/31/2010 at 10:00 a.m. (MDT). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/20/2010.(sah, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Minute Entry for Telephonic Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/17/2010; Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Modified Scheduling Order 57 is GRANTED IN PART. The Scheduling Order 35 is modified as follows: Discovery Cut-off is extended to 10/4/2010. Expert Discovery Cut-off is extended to 10/18/10. Dispositive Motions deadline is extended to 11/8/2010. Affirmative Expert Reports deadline is extended to 9/10/10. Rebuttal Expert Reports deadline is ext ended to 10/1/10. These extensions will be without prejudice to the parties to jointly request additional extensions in the event that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order for Extension of Trial Dates 59 is granted by Judge Blackburn. (Court Reporter FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/30/2010. (klmcd )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 45 defendants Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of The Courts June 17, 2010 Minute Order and For Extension of Time and Page LimitsDefendants Response To IPHs Motion For Denial of Defendants Motion ForPartial Summary Judgment Per Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(f) [45-1] is accepted for filing. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/18/2010.(erv, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute ORDER granting 40 Motion to Vacate and Reset Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 6/22/10 at 1:30 is VACATED. Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/16/10.(jak, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 12/6/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/19/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/4/10. (rebsec, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (VACATED) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/4/10. The Defendant's Motion to Set a Supplemental Briefing Schedule...[#16] is GRANTED, consistent with the following orders: (1) That by January 6, 2010, at 12:00 p.m. (noon), the pltf s hall file its supplemental brief addressing the issues now raised by and inherent to the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Mandatory Preliminary Injunction [#2], insofar as the pltf is requesting the entry of a mandatory pre liminary injunction; and (2) That by January 8, 2010, at 12:00 p.m. (noon), the deft shall file its response brief to the pltf's supplemental brief. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by January 5, 2010, at 12:00 p.m. (noon), the pltf shall file its response to the Defendant's Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery [#17], filed December 30, 2009. (rebcd) Modified on 1/5/2010 to VACATE pursuant to the Minute Order dated 01/04/2010 (sah, ).
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 2 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Mandatory Preliminary Injunction in so far as it seeks a temporary restraining order. Parties to contact chambers on 1/6/10 at 10:00 a.m. to set plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 2 for hearing, if necessary, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iowa Pacific Holdings, LLC v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Pacific Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Bursell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?