Oddson v. Swift & Company
Plaintiff: Kerry Oddson
Defendant: Swift & Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv03034
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement. Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims is approved. Request for approval of the parties' agreement to pay attorneys fees in the amount representing 35% of the settlement proceeds plus out-of-pocket costs is granted. The service award to the Named Plaintiff in the amount of $2,500 is approved. Clerk to close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/22/10.(gmssl, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/8/10. (msksec, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/26/10. (mskcd)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER resetting Scheduling Conference for 3/8/2010 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/3/10. (cbssec)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 3/4/2010 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/28/10. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oddson v. Swift & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Oddson
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?