Geras v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: David Geras
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Walker D Miller
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Filing 54 MANDATE of USCA as to #45 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras: In accordance with 10th Cir. R. 33.1. and upon consideration of the stipulation of the parties to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, this appeal is dismissed. Each party shall bear their own costs on appeal. (USCA Case No. 11-1153) (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(bjrsl, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 53 MANDATE of USCA as to #49 USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment, #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras: Affirmed. (USCA Case No. 10-1352) (bjrsl, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 52 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #45 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras. ( Appeal No. 11-1153) (gmssl, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 51 USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. 11-1153); received $ 455 receipt number 37243 re #45 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras (gmssl, )
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re #45 Notice of Appeal by David Geras, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Walker D. Miller on 04/19/11. (bjrsl, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 49 USCA Opinion and Judgment as to #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras: The judgment of the district court is affirmed. (USCA Case No. 10-1352) (This document is not the Mandate) (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(bjrsl, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #45 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff David Geras (Liechty, Robert)
April 13, 2011 Filing 47 USCA Case Number 11-1153 for #45 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras. Filing fee due in district court.(bjrsl, )
April 13, 2011 Filing 46 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #45 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel; Fee not paid) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record including Notice of Appeal)(bjrsl, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #44 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff David Geras (Attachments: #1 Conventionally Submitted Order Being Appealed)(Liechty, Robert)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #36 IBM's Petition for Attorneys' Fees. IBM is awarded $3,554.10 in attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/31/11.(mnf, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #36 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Harpole, Jennifer)
September 13, 2010 Filing 42 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras. ( Appeal No. 10-1352) (bjrsl, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 41 USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. 10-1352); received payment of $455, receipt number 31041 re #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras (bjrsl, )
September 2, 2010 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #36 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff David Geras. (Liechty, Robert)
August 31, 2010 Filing 39 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 350.00 against David Geras. (ebs, )
August 27, 2010 Filing 38 USCA LETTER as to #32 Notice of Appeal by David Geras. Appeal fees have not been paid. Within 10 days the fees must be paid to district court or an application for in forma pauperis made to the COurt of Appeals. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the appeal. USCA case no. 10-1352. (bjrsl, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #32 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff David Geras (Liechty, Robert)
August 18, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harpole, Jennifer)
August 18, 2010 Filing 35 Proposed Bill of Costs by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Harpole, Jennifer)
August 12, 2010 Filing 34 USCA Case Number 10-1352 for #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras. (bjrsl, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 33 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Geras to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel; Fee not paid) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record including Notice of Appeal)(bjrsl, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #31 Clerk's Judgment,, #30 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff David Geras (Liechty, Robert)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT by Clerk pursuant to the #29 Order and #30 Order. Plaintiff's claims for a bonus payment are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's Contract and Wage Claim Act claims based on claims to commissions or separation pay are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant is awarded its attorneys' fees and costs associated with that part of the partial motion to dismiss addressing the separation pay issue. Defendant is awarded costs that are to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court, by Clerk and approved as to form by Senior Judge Walker D. Miller on 8/4/10. (ebs, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #8 IBM's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Wage Claim Act and Contract Claims Based on Commission and Separation Pay Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Plaintiff's contract and Wage Claim Act claims based on claims to commissions or separation pay are dismissed with prejudice. No further claims remain pending. IBM is awarded attorneys' fees and costs and shall file an affidavit. IBM may have its costs, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/21/10.(ebs, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice (ORDER) Of Dismissal of Claims For Bonus Payment Only re #28 Stipulation for Dismissal. The claims for said bonus payments are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees which leaves pending only Plaintiff's claims for commissions and separation pay, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/19/10.(lyg, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Bonus Payments with Prejudice by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Harpole, Jennifer)
May 26, 2010 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #26 Supplemental Authority re: #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff David Geras. (Liechty, Robert) Modified on 5/27/2010 to create linkage to document 26 and to delete duplicate text generated by the system (ebs, ).
May 21, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE re #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) (NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harpole, Jennifer) Modified on 5/24/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system (ebs, ).
May 20, 2010 Filing 25 Minute Entry for Settlement proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Settlement Conference was held on 5/20/2010. No settlement was reached. (cbscd)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. Attorney Elizabeth Suzanne McKelvey withdrawn as counsel, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/3/10.(gmssl, )
May 3, 2010 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant filed by International Business Machines Corporation.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/3/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
April 30, 2010 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (McKelvey, Elizabeth)
April 30, 2010 Filing 21 Docket Annotation re: #19 Notice (Other). Counsel has been asked to draft and file a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (ebs, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Thomas G. Mackey by Thomas George Mackey on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Mackey, Thomas)
April 29, 2010 Filing 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF LIZA S. MCKELVEY by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (McKelvey, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2010 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (McKelvey, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/16/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system (ebs, ).
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant shall have up to and including March 15, 2010, in which to file its reply to #8 Partial Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/11/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec)
March 11, 2010 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/11/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, ) Modified on 3/12/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system (ebs, ).
March 11, 2010 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Harpole, Jennifer) Modified on 3/15/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system gmssl, ).
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/4/2010. (cbscd)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Scheduling Conference was held on 3/4/2010. Discovery due by 6/11/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2010. Settlement Conference set for 5/20/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Updated Confidential Settlement Statements due 5/10/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due 5 days prior. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
March 1, 2010 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff David Geras. (Liechty, Robert)
February 22, 2010 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff David Geras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Liechty, Robert) Modified on 2/23/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system (ebs, ).
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 3/4/2010 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/2/10. (cbssec)
February 1, 2010 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to 2 Complaint AND JURY DEMAND by International Business Machines Corporation.(McKelvey, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2010 Filing 8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS WAGE ACT AND CONTRACT CLAIMS BASED ON COMMISSION AND SEPARATION PAY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McKelvey, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2010 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation.. (McKelvey, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2010 Filing 6 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings, pursuant to the Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed on 1/8/10: International Business Machines Corporation answer due 2/1/2010. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (ebs, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/11/10. (wdmsec, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (JOINT) by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Harpole, Jennifer)
January 3, 2010 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Geras. International Business Machines Corporation served on 12/15/2009, answer due 1/5/2010. Text only entry-no document attached. (jak, )
January 3, 2010 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation, filed by David Geras. Text only entry-no document attached. (jak, )
January 3, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Denver City and County District Court, Case Number 09cv11342. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt Number 24673), filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geras v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Thomas George Mackey
Represented By: Elizabeth Suzanne McKelvey
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Geras
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?