USA v. Hinton et al

Petitioner: USA
Respondent: Dan Hinton and Colorado POS Systems, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00178
Filed: January 27, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2010 10 Featured Case CONTEMPT ORDER that Respondent is in civil contempt for failure to comply with the Courts March 4, 2010 Order to Show Cause and May 20, 2010 Order to Show Cause. It is hereby ORDERED that a warrant for Respondents arrest shall be issued and served upon Respondent by the U.S. Marshal Service. Further proceedings will be scheduled in this case if and when appropriate. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/14/2010. (erv, )
June 18, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER re: 12 Contempt Hearing, Pursuant to findings made in open court on June 18, 2010, it is ORDERED that Dan Hinton is released from the custody of the United States Marshal. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/18/2010. (erv, )
March 4, 2010 5 Featured Case FINAL ENFORCEMENT ORDER re: 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by USA. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/4/2010. (erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Hinton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Amanda Adams Rocque
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Hinton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado POS Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]