Squires v. Goodwin et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly N. Squires
Defendant: James Michael Goodwin and Brekenridge Outdoor Education Center
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00309
Filed: February 12, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2011 107 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2011 taking under advisement 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; taking under advisement 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 85 Motion to Strike; denying without prejudice 86 Motion for Order; vacating 8/8/2011 Final Pretrial Conference; vacating 9/12/2011 Jury Trial. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 19, 2011 114 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2011. Granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion to Strike. Parties shall file the CV of Stanley Gale and Exhibit A by close of business on 9/19/11. If the parties would like to set a Motions Hearing, they shall contact chambers by close of business on 9/19/11. (FTR: Emily Seamon) (eseam)
November 7, 2011 119 Featured Case ORDER granting 87 Defendant Mountain Man Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Testimony; granting 58 Defendant Mountain Man Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 Defendant Breckenridge Outdoor Education Center 9;s Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Experts. Defendant Mountain Man, Inc. shall be terminated as a party at this time and judgment on the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 13) shall be entered in favor of Defendant Mountain Man at the conclusion of the entire case. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/07/2011. (cbslc1)
November 8, 2011 120 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Defendant Breckenridge Outdoor Education Center's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Fifth Claim for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 13) shall proceed against Defendant Breckenridge O utdoor Education Center only on the alleged willful and wanton, reckless, or grossly negligent acts or omissions. A Telephonic Status Conference is set on Thursday December 8, 2011 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel for the parties shall create a conference call and then telephone the court at 303-844-2117 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/08/2011. (cbslc1)
December 19, 2011 126 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 12/19/2011. Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify #13 Complaint To Add Claims For Exemplary Damages and Outrageous Conduct Against Defendant Breckenrid ge Outdoor Education Center is DENIED to the extent it seeks to add claims for outrageous conduct as to defendant Breckenridge Outdoor Education Center and is GRANTED to the extent that it adds the request for exemplary damages. The court will issue a written order to this effect. Mr. Meinert shall advise the court and Ms. Squires of intentions regarding Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Mountain Man, Inc. on or before 1/13/2012. If the motion is to be amended or withdrawn it shall be done on or before 1/13/2012. (FTR: Laura Galera and Robin Mason) (cbscd)
January 9, 2012 128 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. # 90). By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/09/2012. (cbslc1)
January 17, 2012 131 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The parties' Stipulation is approved and Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Mountain Man, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear her or its own attorney fees and costs. Defendant Mountain Man, Inc.'s 122 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11(c) is WITHDRAWN, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/17/2012.(wjc, )
February 13, 2012 139 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/13/2012. The court DENIES without prejudice 130 Motion to Continue. The court DENIES as MOOT 132 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties shall revise their Witness Lists and Exhibits Lists and file with the court no later than 2/20/2012. Any parties who would like to file a Motion in Limine must file one no later than 2/29/2012. To the extent that a party files a Motion in Limine, a written response shall be filed no later than 3/14/2012 (there will be no replies accepted). A proposed list of voir dire questions shall be submitted by 3/14/2012. All proposed jury instructions shall be filed no later than 3/14/2012. A Motions hearing is set for 3/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. All counsel who will be participating in the trial must be present at this hearing. The court will need to know, no later than 3/20/2012, if the parties will be using jury notebooks or technology. The court will block out the entire afternoon of 3/23/2012 to allow the parties access to the courtroom to set up for the trial. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
March 20, 2012 232 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2012. On 3/23/2012, the parties shall provide the court with two (2) sets of exhibit notebooks as well as two (2) sets of their finalized witne ss and exhibit lists. For reasons as stated on the record: the court HOLDS IN ABEYANCE 146 Motion in Limine; DENIES 147 Motion in Limine; DENIES 149 Motion in Limine; GRANTS 151 Motion in Limine; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART [15 2] Motion in Limine; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 153 Motion in Limine; HOLDS IN ABEYANCE 156 Motion in Limine; GRANTS 157 Motion in Limine; GRANTS 158 Motion in Limine; GRANTS 159 Motion in Limine; and GRANTS 161 Motio n in Limine. This Motion Hearing is continued to 3/22/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Between now and 3/22/2012 at 2:00 p.m., counsel for the plaintiff shall identify, for the defendant, the evidence it believes is substantially similar for purposes of Rule 404(b). The court will address those specific events at that time. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
March 22, 2012 242 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2012. The court DENIES 145 Motion in Limine. The court DENIES 146 Motion in Limine. The court DENIES 148 Motion in Limine. The co urt GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 150 Motion in Limine. The court GRANTS 154 Motion in Limine. The court GRANTS 155 Motion in Limine. The court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 156 Motion in Limine. The court GRANTS 160 Motion in Limine. The court GRANTS 162 Motion in Limine. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
March 26, 2012 253 Featured Case ORDER re: 248 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant James Michael Goodwin filed by James Michael Goodwin, Kimberly N. Squires. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/26/2012. (jjpsl, )
April 10, 2012 278 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/5/2012. (jjpsl, )
July 31, 2012 296 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2012. The court TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT 287 Motion for Review. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
March 27, 2013 316 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 287 BOEC's Motion to Review Taxation of Costs. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/27/2013. (cbslc1)
February 18, 2010 3 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/10. (bnbcd, )
September 20, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERENCE AND ORDER. The 2 Order of Reference is hereby VACATED. Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland to convene such settlement conferences and direct related proceedings as may facilitate settlement of this case. The deadlines, discovery l imitations, and schedule set forth in the 40 Scheduling Order remain unchanged. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/18/2010 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 09/20/2010. (wjc, )
October 27, 2010 48 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 10/27/2010. ORDERED: The Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Permit Filing of Amended Answer, doc #[ 47] is GRANTED. The Amended Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant Michael Goodwin, doc #[47-1] is ACCEPTED FOR FILING AS OF TODAY'S DATE. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/20/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. A Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due 7 days prior. A ten-day Jury Trial is to commence on 9/12/2011 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
May 23, 2011 82 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Motion Hearing was held on 5/23/2011. ORDERED: Plaintiff is allowed to brief the limited question of misrepresentation on or before 5/30/2011. Daubert o r Rule 702 motions due 6/6/2011. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend her prayer for relief no later than 6/6/2011. Mountain Man's Motion for Summary Judgment, doc # 58 is taken under advisement. The court will await further briefing on BOEC's Motion for Summary Judgment, doc # 52 . By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Squires v. Goodwin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly N. Squires
Represented By: Colleen M. Parsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Michael Goodwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brekenridge Outdoor Education Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]