Fries v. Arculeta
Plaintiff: Anthony Fries
Defendant: Anita Arculeta
Case Number: 1:2010cv00337
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Bent
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER accepting 40 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 31 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/25/10.(ebs, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Claims and Amend to Reflect Proper Defendants. Plaintiff must file any Motion for Leave to Amend his Complaint by 5/7/10, and must include his proposed Amended Complaint as an attachment. Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Prisoner Complaint form, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/10.(ebs, )
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/16/10. (ebs, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. William Thiebault, Jr. is dismissed as a party to this action. The Clerk of Court is to remove the name of William Thiebault, Jr. as a party to this action. The only remaining defendant is Anita Archuleta. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/11/2010. (sah, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/03/10. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fries v. Arculeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Arculeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?