Rocha v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: Marco A. Rocha
Defendant: A. (I) Zavaras, A. Zavaras, Ron (I) Leyba, Ron Leyba, D. (I) Kiefer, D. Kiefer, (I) McKibbin, McKibbin, S. (I) Twilleger, S. Twilleger, Maria (I) Rael, Maria Rael, (I) Vandetti, Vandetti, A. (I) DeCesaro and A. DeCesaro
Case Number: 1:2010cv00357
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 1/3/2012 Recommendation 138 of United States Magistrate Judge; granting 105 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 131 Second Motion for Injunction. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/22/2012.(jjpsl, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER denying 133 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2011. (mehcd)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER granting 126 Defendant's Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2011 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2011. (mehcd)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADOPTS the 106 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge; denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/4/2011.(erv, )
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 112 Plaintiff's Motion on Previous Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/21/2011. (mehcd)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2011.(erv, )
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 90 "Motion for a 54(b) Rule Certification," by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/11/2011. (mehcd)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/21/2011.(erv, )
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 67 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Judgement, and Plaintiffs Amendment to Complaint 76 is STRICKEN as being an unauthorized filing; and In light of this Courts Order 55 dismissing claims against all Defendants except Defendant Twilleger, the caption on all subsequent filings shall be set forth as indicated in the caption to this Order. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/3/2011.(erv, )
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/11/2011. (mehcd)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTS AND AFFIRMS 52 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Granting in part and Denying in part 37 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; All claims against all Defendants, except for Plaintiffs First Amendment claim of retaliation against Defendant Twilleger, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/29/2011.(erv, )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO MAKE MONTHLY FILING FEE PAYMENT OR TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before March 31, 2011, Plaintiff shall either make the required monthly payments for January, February, and March 2011, and by the 15th of each month thereaft er, or file a properly certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement demonstrating that he is not required pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2) to make a monthly payment. Plaintiff is instructed that the statement be certified by a prison official, and not by himself. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the complaint and this civil action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/10/2011. (mehcd)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's renewed Motion to Amend Complaint; denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Plaintiff's Amended Complaint located at Docket #32-1. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/30/2010. (mehcd)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. The Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2010 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/26/2010. (mehcd)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER denying 2 as moot Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/18/2010. (mehcd)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 4 Complaint, filed by Marco A. Rocha by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/17/2010. (erv, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Assigning Case. This case shall be assigned to District Judge Christine M. Arguello, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40. 1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/12/2010. (sah, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a complaint and 1915 motion on the proper court forms, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco A. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. (I) Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron (I) Leyba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Leyba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. (I) Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) McKibbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKibbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. (I) Twilleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Twilleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria (I) Rael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Rael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Vandetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. (I) DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?