March 22, 2012 |
Filing
588
ORDER granting 565 Plaintiffs Motion to Stay. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending a motion to reopen for good cause shown after the California action has concluded, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/22/2012.(ervsl, )
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
562
ORDER Defendant Garretts Partial Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 196 is DENIED; Defendant Ables Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 217 is DENIED; Plaintiffs Fourth Claim for Relief is thus DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiffs ECF 559 is GRANTED; Defendant Able's Supplemental Brief Regarding Applicability of California Law, ECF No. 556 is STRICKEN, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/27/2012.(ervsl, )
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing
553
ORDER : A status conference occurred concerning outstanding discovery issues. Rulings were made on the record, which are incorporated, in the order. Consistent with matters discussed at the status conference, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/13/12. (bnbcd, )
|
February 6, 2012 |
Filing
547
AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/6/2012. (ervsl, )
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
542
ORDER denying 101 Defendant Garretts Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice to Garrett refiling said motion before expiration of the dispositive motion deadline, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/31/2012.(ervsl, )
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing
539
ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 511 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 514 Ables Motion for Enlargement of Time to Supplement Its Responses to SBMs Discovery Requests; denying as moot 521 SBMs Motion to Enforce Prelim inary Injunction and to Inspect Defendant Garretts Computer Equipment. Status Report due by 2/2/2012. Status Conference set for 2/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/27/12.(bnbcd, )
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
502
ORDER : re: 472 MOTION to Compel Able to Produce Documents in Response to SBMS First Set of Requests for Production filed by SBM Site Services, LLC,is granted in part and denied in part. 480 MOTION to Compel INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND PR ODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by SBM Site Services, LLC is granted in part and denied in part. Discovery due by 7/27/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2012. The parties shall designate all experts on or before June 8, 2012. The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts on or beforeJuly 6, 2012, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/5/11. (bnbcd, )
|
November 14, 2011 |
Filing
487
ORDER: denying 456 Motion for Contempt; denying 475 Motion for Leave to file Surreply; granting 194 Motion to Strike. SBM may file a renewed opposition, that complies with the local rules of this court, on or before December 5, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/14/11.(bnbcd, )
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
455
MINUTE ORDER : denying as moot 441 Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/19/11.(bnbcd, )
|
August 26, 2011 |
Filing
440
ORDER : regarding access to information, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/26/11. (bnbcd, )
|
August 16, 2011 |
Filing
432
MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 379 Defendant John Garretts Motion for Additional Time; Denying as moot 398 SBM Site Services, LLCs Amended Emergency Motion for Compliance With June 13, 2011 Order and Preliminary Injunction by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/16/2011.(erv, )
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
376
ORDER: denying 367 Motion to Clarify, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/23/11.(bnbcd, )
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
364
ORDER granting 173 Garrett Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 259 Able Motion for Preliminary Injunction (See Order for details) by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/13/2011.(erv, )
|
May 20, 2011 |
Filing
360
ORDER : denying 357 Motion for Protective Order. Discovery due by 12/5/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2011. The parties shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before October 3, 2011. The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before November 3, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/20/11. (bnbcd, )
|
April 12, 2011 |
Filing
349
ORDER granting 208 Motion to Withdraw Admissions; granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply ; granting 257 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Seal Records ; denying 277 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/2011.(erv, )
|
April 11, 2011 |
Filing
344
MINUTE ORDER : Granting 336 Defendant John Garretts Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of the Motion for a Protective Order Regarding SBMs Requests for Production Set Two. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Reply to docket no. 336 for filing, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/11/11.(bnbcd, )
|
April 8, 2011 |
Filing
343
MINUTE ORDER: granting 338 Amended Joint Motion for Permission to Obtain Sealed Transcripts for Proceedings of March 25, 2011, and March 30, 2011, Hearings on Motions for Preliminary Injunction. All parties are entitled to obtain sealed copies of the transcripts of the hearings that took place on March 25, 2011, and March 30, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/8/11.(bnbcd, )
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
332
MINUTE ORDER: granting 330 Defendants Joint Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Rule 53(a)(1)(C). The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the defendants joint reply (attachment 1 to docket no. 330) in support of defendants Joint Motion for Appointment of Special Master (docket no. 233), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/5/11.(bnbcd, )
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing
325
ORDER STRIKING 323 Defendant Crown Building Maintenance, Inc.s Letter, 324 Plaintiff SBM Site Services, LLCs letter. The local rules of this court prohibit ex parte communication with judicial officers: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/28/2011. (erv, )
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
291
ORDER : Granting in part and denying in part 278 Defendant Ables Motion to Stay or, In the Alternative, Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Other Relief. Granting in part and denying in part 280 Defendant John Garretts Mo tion to Continue Hearing on SBMs Motions for Preliminary Injunctions and Request for an Emergency Telephone Hearing. GRANTED insofar as they seek an emergency telephone hearing, which occurred this afternoon; GRANTED insofar as they seek to continue the hearing on the plaintiffs motions forpreliminary unjunction. DENIED in all other respects. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Defendants shall file their responses to the motions for preliminary injunction on or before March 21, 2011,by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/9/11.(bnbcd, )
|
March 4, 2011 |
Filing
275
ORDER OF REFERENCE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) re: 259 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Crown Building Services, Inc., dba Able Services filed by SBM Site Services, LLC., is referred to Magistrate Judge Boland for disposition. by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/4/2011. (erv, )
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing
269
ORDER re: 259 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Crown Building Services, Inc., dba Able Services filed by SBM Site Services, LLC.; That the parties file, on or before March 7, 2011, a notice indicating whether they agree to a part ial consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1), to allow Magistrate Judge Boland to decide Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction against Crown Building Services, Inc. by Order instead of recommended disposition. by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/3/2011. (erv, )
|
February 23, 2011 |
Filing
235
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 173 . Ordered that the parties file, on or before 02/28/11, a notice indicating whether they agree to a partial consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1), to allow Magistrate Judge Boland to decide Plaintiffs preliminary injunction motion 17 by order instead of recommended disposition by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/23/11. (jjh, )
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
225
ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2011. (erv, )
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
222
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion to Vacate and Stay ; denying as moot 218 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone. Supplemental Scheduling Conference Reset for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/15/2011.(erv, )
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing
184
ORDER: re: Granting in part and denying in part 180 MOTION for supplemental Protective Order filed by John Garrett. Denying as moot 116 The Motion to Enforce ESI Plan. Granting in part and denying in part 127 MOTION to Compel Further Inspectio n of Garrett's Computer Equipment; Production of Documents Provided by Third-Parties; and Garrett's Written Discovery Responses; and Request for Sanctions filed by SBM Site Services, LLC, Granting 103 MOTION for Leave to File First Amende d Complaint filed by SBM Site Services, LLC. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Plaintiff SBM Site Services, LLCs First Amended Complaint [Doc. # 103-1]. Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall submit a revised proposed scheduling order on or before February 14, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/21/11. (bnbcd, )
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
126
MINUTE ORDER: denying 122 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Enforce the Court Ordered ESI Discovery Plan, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/3/11.(bnbcd, )
|
December 30, 2010 |
Filing
125
ORDER approving and adopting 107 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Trial Preparation Conference currently scheduled for 2/11/2011, at 3:00 PM, as well as the trial currently scheduled to commence on 2/28/2011, at 8:30 AM are VACATED and CONTINUED pending further order of the court. The Trial Preparation Conference and trial shall be reset during a Telephonic Setting Conference on 1/24/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/30/10. (mnf, )
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing
109
MINUTE ORDER: Defendant John Garretts Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset the Discovery Deadlines and Request for a Status Hearing [Doc. # 93, filed 11/18/2010] is GRANTED, and all deadlines established in the Scheduling Order are VACATED; A hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is set for January 19, 2011, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado; and A schedule for the remainder of this case will be set at the hearing on January 19,2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/2/10. (bnbcd, )
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
92
ORDER. The Motion to Extend 86 is GRANTED and the case schedule is modified to extend the discovery cut-off to and including 12/03/2010, solelyto allow the plaintiff to subpoena and conduct a deposition concerning the defendants dropbox account and to conduct the depositions of (1) Rich Mulkerrins, (2) Paul Boschetto, (3) Mark Kelly, (4) John Garrett, and (5) Charles Somers. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/10/2010.(sah, )
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
83
MINUTE ORDER. The Joint Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel of Record for Defendant John Garrett 78 is GRANTED. Attorneys Denise D. Riley and Michelle E. Cormier are withdrawn from the representation of defendant and are to be removed from the electronic filing. Larry R. Martinez and Robin L. Nolan are now counsel representing defendant. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/21/2010.(sah, )
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
77
ORDER : granting 55 Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Defendants Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff. Denying 60 Plaintiff SBM Site Services, LLCs Motion Requesting Additional Time for the Deposition of John Garrett Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(1). granting in part and denying in part 65 Plaintiff SBM Site Services Motion to Compel Responses, Inspection and Production [FRCP 37(a)], by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/19/10.(bnbcd, )
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER. The case schedule is modified to the following extent: Fact Discovery Cut-Off 11/19/2010; Expert Discovery Cut-Off 12/15/2010; Dispositive Motions Deadline 11/19/2010. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/07/2010. (sah, )
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ORDER. The Joint Motion To Vacate and Continue The Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conferences and The Trial Date 45 filed 08/17/2010 is DENIED without prejduice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/26/2010.(sah, )
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
47
ORDER : granting in part and denying in part 44 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The Motion for Extension [Doc. # 44] is GRANTED IN PART and the case schedule is modified to the following extent: Expert Discovery Cut- Off: November 19, 2 010. Expert Disclosures: (a) The parties shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before September 17, 2010; and (b) The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before October 18, 2010. The Motion for Extension is DENIED in all other respects, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/24/10.(bnbcd, )
|
June 14, 2010 |
Filing
39
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/14/10. (gms, )
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
27
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Fifteenn (15) day Jury Trial set for 2/28/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/11/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/19/10. (rebsec, )
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/8/10. (bnbcd, )
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER. Plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order, as asserted in Plaintiffs Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order To Show Causeas to a Preliminary Injunction 6 , filed 02/23/2010, is DENIED. A telephonic motions setting heari ng conference IS SET for 03/11/2010, at 10:30 a.m. MST, with the courts Judicial Assistant, Ms. Susan Schmitz, at (303) 335-2350. Counsel for plaintiff SHALL ARRANGE and COORDINATE the conference call necessary to facilitate the setting conference by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/04/2010. (sah, )
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing
15
Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/3/2010. ORDER: Taking under advisement 6 Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order. (Court Reporter Suzanne Claar) (lbush)
|