K2C2, LLC v. Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Plaintiff: K2C2, LLC
Defendant: Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00389
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion For Dismissal 77 filed 4/7/2011, is GRANTED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/7/2011. (sah, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY REGARDING CERTAIN SPECIFIC DOCUMENTS, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/12/2010. (klmcd )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint 28 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint [Docket No. 28- 1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendant Harcros Chemicals, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint, if any, on or before 07/16/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/25/2010.(sah, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/25/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Bench Trial set for 2/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/15/10. (rebsec, )
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendant Harcros Chemicals Inc.s Motion for Leave to Appear at 06/15/2010 Scheduling Conference via Telephone. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/10/2010.(sah, )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear at 06/15/2010 Scheduling Conference via Telephone 16 is GRANTED. On the date and time of the Scheduling Conference, counsel for Plaintiff shall contact Chambers at (303) 335-2770 to participate. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/08/2010.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K2C2, LLC v. Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K2C2, LLC
Represented By: Erik G. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: David Simon Steefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?