Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Barco et al
Plaintiff: |
Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Jose Miguel Barco and Ginny Stefancic |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00501 |
Filed: |
March 3, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 14, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER. That the 36 Stipulation To Dismiss Second and Third Counts of Complaint is approved. Count II and Count III of plaintiff's 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment are dismissed with prejudice. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/ 25/2011 at 3:00 PM and the trial set for 3/28/2011 are vacated. Judgment shall enter on behalf of plaintiff and against defendants in accordance with the previous 35 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Costs are denied in accordance with the parties' stipulation regarding same. This action is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/14/11. (mnf, )
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
35
ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 23 filed 10/1/2010, is GRANTED IN PART. At the time judgment enters, judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of plaintiff, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, against defendants, Jose Miguel Barco and Ginny Stefancic, as to Count I of plaintiffs Complaint. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/31/2010.(sah, )
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER: The proposed final pretrial order is REFUSED for the reasons stated on the record; and A supplemental final pretrial conference is set for December 3, 2010, at 4:00 p.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 9 01 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. A revised proposed final pretrial order, modified as discussed on the record today, shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than November 29, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/17/10. (bnbcd, )
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
17
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Three (3) Bench Trial set for 3/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/25/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/27/10. (rebsec, )
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/17/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/15/2010. (sah, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?