Deuty v. Hewlett-Packard Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Scott William Deuty
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Corporation, Ron Rogers and Jessica Swank
Case Number: 1:2010cv00562
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 91 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. Plaintiffs Objection 97 is OVERRULED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to A mend Complaint 54 is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendants Combined Motion to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies and for Summary Judgment as to Remaining Claims 62 is GRANTED consistent with this Order and this matter is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/01/11.(jjh, )
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Reconsideration. The documents shall remain sealed until further order of the court by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/20/11.(jjh, )
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Order denying 65 Motion for Relief from Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.60. Order that Defendants' Accounting of Attorneys' Fees Incurred in Responding to Motion to Compel 58 is Accepted in part. Defendants are awarded the total sum of $4,837.25 against Plaintiff pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(a)(5)(B) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/06/11.(jjh, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. Order denying 48 Motion to Compel. ORDERED that, no later than 03/14/11, Defendants shall provide the court with an accounting of their expenses, including attorneys fees, incurred in opposing Plaintiffs motion. Plaintiff may respond to the reasonableness of this accounting no later than 03/28/11 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/04/11.(jjh, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting 42 Motion to Compel. Written deposition questions which Plaintiff previously refused to answer will be sent to Plaintiff by January 13, 2011. Pl aintiff will answer questions under oath and submit responses to Defendants on or before January 28, 2011. Discovery cut-off will be extended to February 14, 2011 only for the purpose of completion of depositions by Plaintiff of the individuals name d in the attached minutes. The court will make available a room at the federal courthouse to conduct the depositions upon notice by either party that the depositions will move forward. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2011. For more information, see attached minutes. (Court Reporter: FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/14/2010.(erv, )
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/3/2010. (erv, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER re: 26 Order Settlement Conference set for 10/20/2010 01:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/20/2010. (erv, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 10/20/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/13/10. (lyg, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2010 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/2010. (erv, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 03/29/2010. (sah, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/22/2010. (sah, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a complaint with an original signature, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/9/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deuty v. Hewlett-Packard Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott William Deuty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Swank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?