April 10, 2012 |
Filing
118
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/10/12. (jjhsl, )
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
115
ORDER of Dismissal of Parties. Order granting 114 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Nathan Ahlbrecht, William Frangis, Shayne Heap, Robert Peterson, Doug Dixon and Michelle Nail. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall amend the case caption to reflect the dismissal of these Defendants by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/29/12.(jjhsl, )
|
February 29, 2012 |
Filing
111
ORDER. ORDERED that because the District Court is divested of jurisdiction over this matter, both the Final Trial Preparation Conference set for March 30, 2012 and the Jury Trial set for April 23, 2012 are hereby VACATED pending a resolution of the interlocutory appeal by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/29/12. (jjhsl, )
|
January 26, 2012 |
Filing
104
ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants Frangis, Peterson, Dixon, Heap, Mattive, ElbertCounty Sheriffs Office and Elbert Countys Motion for Summary Judgment 70 is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs first claim for relief (Unlawful Search and Seizure and Exce ssive Force), Plaintiffs second, fourth, and fifth claims for relief (Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress, Assault, and Battery), and Plaintiffs' tenth claim for relief (Violation of Due Process 14th Amendment). The motion is GRANTED w ith respect to Plaintiffs eighth claim for relief (Unlawful Search and Seizure Malicious Prosecution) and Plaintiffs' ninth claim for relief (Failure to Train and/or Supervise Employees and Lack of Policies Resulting in Constitutional Violation s). ORDERED that Defendant Albrechts [sic] Motion for Summary Judgment 68 is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs' first claim for relief (Unlawful Search and Seizure and Excessive Force), Plaintiffs second, third, and fourth claims for relief ( Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress, Abuse of Process, and Assault), and Plaintiff's tenth claim for relief (Violation of Due Process 14th Amendment). The motion is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs eighth claim for relief(Unlawful Se arch and Seizure Malicious Prosecution) and Plaintiffs' fifth claim for relief (Battery). Accordingly, judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant Ahlbrecht on Plaintiffs' eighth and fifth claims for relief by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/26/12.(jjh, )
|
October 6, 2011 |
Filing
100
ORDER granting 95 Motion to Caption and Pleadings by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/06/11.(jjh, )
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
58
ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Tenth and Eleventh Claims 43 is granted in part and denied in part. See Order for details by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/16/11.(jjh, )
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting 48 Plaintif's Unopposed Motion to Vacate November 9th, 2010 Show Cause Hearing; granting 48 Motion to Dismiss John Does 1-7 from this action. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/8/2010.(erv, )
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing
33
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/9/2010. Order to Show Cause and Show Cause Hearing continued to 11/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judg e Michael J Watanabe. Granting 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. First Amended Complaint [29-1] accepted for filing. Granting 31 Plaintiff's Unopposed Second Motion to Amend Complaint. Second Amended Complaint [31-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order and the Second Amended Complaint is the operative pleading. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing
28
PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/2010. (mjwcd)
|
June 14, 2010 |
Filing
19
MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Re-Set Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference RESET for 7/14/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/14/2010.(erv, )
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/26/2010. (mjwcd)
|