Caught Fish Enterprises, LLC et al v. Action Manufacturing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Caught Fish Enterprises, LLC, RMH Tech, LLC and Metal Roof Innovations, Ltd.
Defendant: Action Manufacturing, LLC, Riddel & Company, Inc., Richard A. Riddell and Paul Riddell
Case Number: 1:2010cv00656
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101 (35:101 Patent Infringement)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice 836 is APPROVED. Any pending motion is DENIED AS MOOT. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/27/2011. (sah, )
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. Plaintiffs' 62 ( 59 sealed document) Motion To Dismiss Counterclaims Nos. 1 and 2 [Doc No. 53 ; Sealed Doc. No. 55 ] is denied. Plaintiffs' 63 ( 60 sealed document) Motion To Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defense Nos. 9 and 10 [Doc. No. 53 ; Sealed Doc. No. 55 ] is denied. Plaintiffs' 35 ( 32 sealed document) Motion To Dismiss Counterclaims [Doc No. 25 ] and Plaintiffs' 36 ( 33 sealed document) Motion to Strike Defendants Affirmative Defense Nos. 2, 9 and 10 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/11.(mnf, )
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 19 Plaintiffs' Unredacted Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing, denying as moot 8 Plaintiff's Redacted Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/17/10.(gmssl, )
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant RichardA. Riddell 23 filed 05/13/2010, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, Richard A. Riddell, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Defendant, Richard A. Riddell, is DROPPED as a named party to this litigation, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/13/2010. (sah, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To Withdraw Sealed Document Designation For Redacted Motion For Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 8] 9 filed 04/13/2010, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Redacted Motion For Preliminary Injunction (With Incorporated Authority and Supporting Evidence) and Request For Hearing 8 filed under seal 04/12/2010, is WITHDRAWN, and shall be UNSEALED. Plaintiffs Motion To File Under Seal 7 filed 04/12/2010, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/13/2010.(sah, )
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Briefing on Markman Issues. Joint claim contruction statement due 90 days after the first answer is filed and briefing on cliam construction shall proceed as set forth in the order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/23/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caught Fish Enterprises, LLC et al v. Action Manufacturing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caught Fish Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMH Tech, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metal Roof Innovations, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddel & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?