March 5, 2012 |
Filing
207
ORDER granting 203 ( 204 ) Stipulated Motion to Administratively Close Action. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE thisaction pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 and The parties are GRANTED leave to move to reopen this action upon a showing of good cause as set forth in D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/5/12.(lyg, )
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
200
Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and/or Depositions by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/22/2012. (ervsl, )
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing
182
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine ; granting in part and denying in part 154 Defendants Joint Motion in Limine, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/27/2012.(ervsl, )
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
152
ORDER denying 103 Defendants Joseph C. Brady and Stephanie L. Bradys Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/7/2011.(ervsl, )
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
151
MINUTE ENTRY for Oral Argument Hearing held on 11/22/2011 before Judge William J. Martinez. Taking under advisement 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; written order shall issue. (Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel) (rebcd)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
146
ORDER denying as withdrawn 122 Motion for Sanctions; granting 144 Motion to Withdraw. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions set for August 15, 2011, at 1:30 p.m., is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/11.(bnbcd, )
|
June 17, 2011 |
Filing
136
MINUTE ORDER : granting 134 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs 122 Motion for Sanctions, Including the Entry of Default Judgment, Against the Defendants Joseph Brady and Stephanie Brady. Defendants shall respond to the Motion for Sanctions 122 on or before June 30, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/17/11.(bnbcd, ) (Modified on 6/17/2011 added link to 134 )(erv, ).
|
June 1, 2011 |
Filing
133
MINUTE ORDER: granting 131 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions, Including the Entry of Default Judgment, Against the Defendants Joseph Brady and Stephanie Brady 122 ; Defendants shall respond to the Motion for Sanctions 122 on or before June 16, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/1/11.(bnbcd, ) (Modified on 6/2/2011 Corrected link to 131 ) (erv, ).
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
110
MINUTE ORDER: granting 107 Stipulated Briefing Schedule Re: Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment (docket no. 103) on or before March 28, 2011, and defendants reply brief is to be filed on or before April 25, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/1/11.(bnbcd, )
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2011. (erv, )
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
102
ORDER granting 100 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Order to Modify the Scheduling Order to allow Plaintiff to take videotape Trial Preservation Depositions of his Health Care Witnesses, and Defendants to take Trial Preservation Deposition of their Expert. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/15/2011.(erv, )
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
98
ORDER: re: 90 MOTION to Compel Production of Explanation of Benefits Forms and Other Documents Showing the Amount Paid for Medical Treatment Received by Plaintiff filed by Joseph C. Brady, Stephanie L. Brady is Granted. The plaintiff shall disclose responsive documents on or before February 21,2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/7/11. (bnbcd, )
|
December 13, 2010 |
Filing
88
ORDER: re: 81 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses, Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(2) filed by Joseph C. Brady, Stephanie L. Brady is GRANTED. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: April 18, 2011. Expert Disclosures: (a) The Bradys sha ll provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) concerning the opinions of Michael Robinson on or before February 18, 2011. (b) The plaintiff shall designate all experts in rebuttal toMichael Robinson and provid e opposing counsel with the information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) in rebuttal to those opinions on or before March 18, 2011 Final Pretrial Conference: The final pretrial conference set for April 14, 2011, at 8:30 a.m., is VACATED and RESE T to May 18, 2011, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than May 11, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/13/10. (bnbcd, )
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER : re: 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Brent A. Jones is Granted. The defendants shall produce responsive documents consistent with this order that are in their actual possession on or before December 14, 2010. In additio n, the defendants shall submit requests or releases for responsive documents in their possession, custody, and control but in the actual possession of others on or before December 14, 2010. The settlement conference set for December 17, 2010, at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED, to be reset at the request of the parties, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/1/10. (bnbcd, )
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
80
ORDER : The following schedule for the remaining depositions to be taken in the case is established: Progressive Ins. Co. 11/30/2010, at 10:00 a.m.; Jon Karraker, C.P.A. 11/30/2010, at 2:00 p.m.; Pueblo Bank & Trust Co., Inc. 12/20/2010, at 11:00 a.m .; Michael Robinson 1/7/2011, beginning not later than 1:30 p.m.; Jeffrey Sabin, M.D. 1/12/2011, at 4:30 p.m.; Ashley Ahrens, Ph.D. 1/13/2011, at 10:00 a.m.; J. Scott Bicknell, M.D. 1/18/2011, at 5:30 p.m.; and Thomas Puschak, M.D. 1/25/2011, at 9:00 a.m.; and (2) This deposition schedule may be modified only by order of the court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/10. (bnbcd, )
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
58
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, Motions terminated: 54 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Brent A. Jones. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/23/2010. (erv, )
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing
38
MINUTE ORDER: granting 33 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint. Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand, attached to the Supplement, docket no. 36-1. The motions hearing set for July 27, 2010, is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/26/10.(bnbcd, )
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing
11
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/9/10. (bnbcd, )
|