Brode v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Brode
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC, US Bank, Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc, Washington Mutual Inc., Aronowitz and Mecklenburg, LLP and Susan J. Hendrick
Case Number: 1:2010cv00692
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED ORDER. ORDERS that Plaintiff's Motion for Release of Bond 75 is GRANTED. The $1000.00 bond posted by Plaintiff in March 2010, plus any interest that has accrued, is released to Plaintiff, and shall be delivered to Plaintiff's counsel by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/26/12. (jjhsl, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Enforcing Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Case. ORDERED that Defendants Joint Motion to (A) Enforce Settlement Agreement, (B) Dismiss the Case With Prejudice, and (C) Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution of this Motion 65 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS MOOT consistent with this Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/04/11. (jjh, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Minute ORDER granting 67 Unopposed Motion to Hold All Existing Pre-Trial Deadlines in Abeyance Pending the Court's Determination of the Joint Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. All existing pre-trial deadlines are held in abeyance pending the Court's Determination of the Joint Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Briefing is required on the motion to enforce the settlement, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/2/10.(lyg, )
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), (2), (4), and (6) and Brief in Support Thereof 18 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART consistent with this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction 10 , and 22 , are DENIED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/6/2010. (erv, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 57 Defendants Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., Chase Home Finance, LLC, and U.S. Bank as Trustee for WMALT Series 2007, OA3 Trust, Joint Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Rule 16 Scheduling/Planning conference. Defendants PHM, Chase and US Ba nk shall have untl 7/30/2010 to respond to complaint. Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/29/2010.(erv, ) (Modified on 6/29/2010 added text regarding Defendants response to complaint to 7/30/2010) (erv, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2010. (mjwcd)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER re: 17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/19/10. (wydcd, rrk) (Modified on 4/20/2010 added the name of the Magistrate Judge)(erv, ).
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. It is FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c), the Court has ordered the Plaintiff to post a one thousand dollar ($1,000.00) security with the Clerks Office, which amount was ten dered to the Court by Plaintiff on March 25, 2010, prior to the entry of this Order. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 4/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/25/2010.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brode v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Brode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aronowitz and Mecklenburg, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan J. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?