Hyland-Riggs v. Michaud et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Hyland-Riggs
Defendant: David Michaud, Mary Carlson, Jeaneene Miller, Deal and Duran
Case Number: 1:2010cv00714
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION. The Court OVERRULES Ms. Hyland-Riggs' Objections 73 and ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 72 . Ms. Hyland-Riggs' Motion for Default Judgment 69 ) is DENIED. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/22/12.(mjgsl, )
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: re: 25 Letter filed by Lisa Hyland-Riggs, 49 Letter filed by Lisa Hyland-Riggs, 57 Letter filed by Lisa Hyland-Riggs, 55 Letter filed by Lisa Hyland-Riggs are STRICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/7/11. (bnbcd, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS: For the foregoing reasons, Mr. Michaud's Motion to Dismiss 18 is GRANTED, and all claims against Mr. Michaud are DISMISSED. Ms. Deal's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 38 is GRANTED, and all claims against Ms. Deal are DISMISSED. The caption of the case is amended to omit reference to these Defendants. All future pleadings shall reflect the modified caption. Ms. Deal's Motion for Sanctions 51 is DENIED AS MOOT. ENTERED BY: Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/15/11.(msksec, )
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Rule 16 Hearing set for 8/2/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/7/10. (msksec, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The Defendant Betty Deal's 26 Letter is STRICKEN. Ms. Deal shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in compliance with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before 08/23/2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/17/2010. (wjc, )
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/22/10. (bnbcd, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/24/10. (mskcd)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/18/2010. (wjc, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a complaint and 1915 motion on the proper court forms, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/26/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyland-Riggs v. Michaud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hyland-Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeaneene Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?