Melson v. Finance America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Daniel R. Melson |
Defendant: |
Finance America, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, CIT Group/Consumer Financing, Inc., The, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., Park County, Public Trustee of and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00784 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Park |
Presiding Judge: |
John L. Kane |
Nature of Suit: |
Consumer Credit |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 1, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER: Counsel for defendants (a) Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.; (b) MortgageElectronic Registration Systems, Inc.; and (c) U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee onBehalf of the Holders of the CSMC Trust 2006-CF2, CS Mortgage Pass-Through Cert ificate Series 2006-CF2 are excused from attending the status conference on November 3, 2010; and The status conference will go forward as scheduled on November 3, 2010, at 8:30 a.m., and counsel for the plaintiff shall appear to address his intentions with respect to the Public Trustee of Park County; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; and the CIT Group/Consumer Financing, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/10. (bnbcd, )
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER: Plaintiff is granted to and including 11/8/10 within which to make service of process upon defendant Finance America, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/8/10. (ebs, )
|
April 27, 2010 |
Filing
14
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/27/10. (bnbcd, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Melson v. Finance America, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Melson |
Represented By: |
John W. Swanson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Finance America, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CIT Group/Consumer Financing, Inc., The |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Keith Alan Gantenbein, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Park County, Public Trustee of |
Represented By: |
Herbert C. Phillips |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?