August 22, 2012 |
Filing
287
Final ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. The 285 Motion to Dismiss is granted and the above captioned action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/22/12.(lygsl, )
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
270
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 261 Defendant James Sublett's Motion for Sanctions and Attorney's Fees, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/31/2012. (mehcd)
|
May 23, 2012 |
Filing
265
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 259 First Home Title Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and 37 for Failure to Provide Disclosure Documents and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Dismissal papers due by 6/8/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/23/2012. (mehcd)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
239
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidential Information, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/5/11. (lsw, )
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
230
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A twelve-day Jury Trial is set for 10/15/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Trial Preparation Conference reset for 9/21/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Trial Preparation Conference set February 12, 2012 is vacated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/22/2011. (rbjsec. )
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing
214
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 196 the Unopposed Motion to Join in Motions to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant First Home Title, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/1/2011. (mehcd)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
199
ORDER on All Pending Motions to Dismiss. GDW's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 121 is denied. The motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 134 is denied. The motion to dismiss 136 is granted with respect to the breach of contract claim arising out of alleged direct loans by plaintiff. The motion is also granted with respect to the RICO claim asserted under 18 U.S.C. 1962(b). Otherwise, the motion is denied. The motion to dismiss for lack of personal ju risdiction 139 is denied. The motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted with respect to the RICO claim asserted under 18 U.S.C. 1962(b) but is otherwise denied. The motion 140 is granted with respect to the RICO claim asserted under 18 U.S.C. 1962(b) but is otherwise denied, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/14/11.(lyg, )
|
September 26, 2011 |
Filing
188
MINUTE ORDER granting 185 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The settlement conference scheduled in this case for 10/13/2011 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/26/11.(mnf, )
|
September 15, 2011 |
Filing
181
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 178 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/15/2011. (mehcd)
|
September 13, 2011 |
Filing
180
MINUTE ORDER. The motions to dismiss docketed as 40 , 47 , and 59 each are DENIED as moot. Defendant First Home Builders of Floridas Motion For Extension of Time To File a Reply in Support of Motion To Dismiss 154 filed 2/25/2011, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/13/2011.(sah, )
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing
170
MINUTE ORDER granting 168 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference reset for 10/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/3/2011. (mehcd)
|
April 19, 2011 |
Filing
167
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 165 the Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss Based on Jurisdictional Grounds filed by Defendants Builders Mortgage Company, LLC, First Home Builders of Florida, First Hom e Title, Inc., Gates, DAlessandro & Woodyard, Inc., Patrick Logue, and James Sublett. A temporary stay is entered and will be lifted on 7/1/2011 or upon the denial (whether in whole or in part) of their motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, whichever occurs first. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/19/2011. (mehcd)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
147
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Limitation in its Response in Opposition To The Motion To Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Filed by Defendants K. Hovnanian First Homes, LLC and First Mortgage Lenders of Florida, LLC [145 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Response in Opposition To Motion To Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Filed by Defendants K. Hovnanian First Homes, LLC and First Mortgage Lenders of Florida, LLC 146 is accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/14/2011.(sah, )
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
124
MINUTE ORDER. The Motion By K. Hovnanian First Homes, LLC and First Mortgage Lenders of Florida, LLC for Permission To File Consolidated Motion To Dismiss 123 filed 1/3/2011 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/4/2011.(sah, )
|
December 15, 2010 |
Filing
112
ORDER granting 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand found at docket #70-1. Defendants shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and all applicable local and federal rules. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/15/2010. (mehcd)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
80
MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Clarified Statement of Application of Peay v. Bell South Medical Assistance Plan in Response to Defendant first Home Title's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Clarified Statement of Application of Peay v. Bell South Medical Assistance Plan in Response To Defendant First Home Title's Motion To Dismiss [# 79 -1] is accepted for filing, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/2010.(wjc, )
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing
55
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 51 Plaintiff's "Ex parte" Motion for Substitute Service, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/27/2010. (mehcd)
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing
35
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/30/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/17/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Twelve (12) day Jury Trial set for 3/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
|