Steese, Evans & Frankel, P.C. v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Plaintiff: Steese, Evans & Frankel, P.C.
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Case Number: 1:2010cv01071
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 62 Plaintiff Steese, Evans & Frankel, P.C.s Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 73 Defendant United States Securities and Exchange Commissions Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 75 Intervenor John Does Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Portions of John Does Declaration Submitted in Conjunction With John Does Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/7/2010.(erv, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re: 51 Motion Hearing, IT IS ORDERED that Docs. # 16, 17, 18, 23, and 25 shall remain sealed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Intervenor Defendant shall cause to be publicly filed, on or before July 30, 2010, the following:John Does Motion to Intervene, dated June 7, 2010, with Part II contained on pages 3-4 redacted; Attorney Declaration of Stephen C. Peters In Support of Intervenor John Does Motion to Intervene, dated June 7, 2010, with 3 on page 2 redacted; and John Does Reply In Support of Motions to Seal and to Utilize the Pseudonym John Doe on All Papers Served on the Other Parties In This Case, dated June 14, 2010, with page 4 redacted. Dated July 26 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/26/2010. (erv, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Intervene. Intervenor defendant to file his answer in intervention by close of business today. Defendant intervenor allowed to proeed by Pseudonym John Doe. On or before 7/30/10 he's to submit a notice in camera for court view only disclosing true identity. Granting 29 Motion for Relief. There will be no discovery, no expert witnesses and case will be decided on cross-motions for summary judgment. Plaintiff to file amended complaint on or before 7/28/10 . Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2010. Granting in part and denying in part 16 and 17 Motion to Seal as set forth in the order; granting 18 Motion to Seal; denying 23 Motion to Seal; granting in part 25 Motion to Seal as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/23/10.(gmssl, )
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/25/10. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steese, Evans & Frankel, P.C. v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steese, Evans & Frankel, P.C.
Represented By: Phillip L. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?