Hill v. City of Aurora, Colorado
Plaintiff: Georg K. Hill
Defendant: City of Aurora, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2010cv01134
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ORDER granting 190 Motion for Protective Order and Limited Stay of Proceedings. This case is stayed until 3/22/2012. The Dispositive Motions deadline is extended until further order of this court, and the Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2012 is vacated. Status Report due by 3/22/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/8/12.(mnfsl, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER. The Court discerns no reason to keep the present matter (11-cv-00010-PAB-KMT) open during the pendency of Civil Action No. 10-cv-01134-PAB-KMT and will administratively close it pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. The case is administratively closed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/30/12. (mnfsl, )
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 AMENED 2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/11. (pabcd)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 167 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Minute Order. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/15/11.(mnfsl, )
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 104 Plaintiff's (Combined) and (Opposed) Motion For: I. Pending Appeal, a "Stay" on Case and All Case Proceedings and until the Courts Can Rectify Errors in Case Processing and Proceedings; II. Pending A ppeal, Relief from Any and All Orders on Case and All Case Proceedings, and until the Courts Can Rectify Errors in Case Processing and Proceedings. This case is STAYED pending a ruling by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals regarding Case Nos. 11-1287 and 11-1289. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of the Circuit Court's ruling on Plaintiff's appeals. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/7/11.(mnfsl, )
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. Attorney Derek W. Cole's [ 151] (Verified) Motion for: Relief from Orders is granted in part. Plaintiff's Counsel's 120 Motion to Withdraw from Case will continue to be taken under advisement. Plaintiff's 155 (Opposed ) Motion For: As a Matter of "Necessity," and Consistent with Plaintiff's Rights Under the United States Constitution and Rule 1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Motions Hearing, Wherein the Court (1) Regains Control of Plaintiff's Cases, and (2) Clarification of Plaintiff's Request for Plaintiff's Attorney to Withdraw is denied. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/6/11.(mnfsl, )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. Plaintiffs 101 objection to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya's 6/14/2011 91 Order is overruled. Defendant's 111 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/25/11.(mnf, )
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. Sanctions in the amount of $4,130.00 are hereby awarded to the Defendant and against Plaintiff's counsel Derek W. Cole. Sanctions shall be remitted in full on or before 9/3/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/3/11. (mnf, )
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Plaintiff's 77 Motion for Leave to File (Amended) Complaint filed inCivil Action No. 10-cv-01134-PAB-KMT is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Amended) Complaint filed in Civil Action No. 11-cv-00010-MSK-KMT (Doc . No. 19) is denied as moot. No later than 6/21/2011, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consolidating the factual allegations and causes of action previously contained in the complaints from both Hill I (10-cv-01134-PAB-KMT, Doc. No. 1 ) and Hill II (11-cv-00010-MSK-KMT, Doc. No. 1). after filing such a consolidated complaint, Plaintiff may again seek leave to add his proposed amendments by filing a motion to amend no later than 6/28/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/14/11.(mnf, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 72 Defendant's Motion to Consolidate. The later-filed case, which is now Civil Action No. 11-cv-00010-PAB-KMT, shall be consolidated with this action. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/11.(mnf, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 83 Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Motion to Compel Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories; granting 84 Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff; and granting 85 Defen dant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond To Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. Having determined there are no issues in dispute w ith respect to the three discovery motions, the hearing currently set for 6/6/2011 at 9:30 AM is vacated. Defendant shall file an itemization of costs, including attorney's fees, associated with efforts to obtain the discovery requested, including the filing of the three motions on or before 6/20/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/1/11.(mnfsl, )
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The settlement conference set for 2/8/2011 is vacated. 62 Plaintiff's (nonresponsive) Motion To: Vacate and Reset, For Good Cause Shown and for the Sake of Judicial Economy, the Settlement Conference is granted, albeit not for the grounds stated in the motion. Plaintiff shall, on or before 2/11/2011 show cause in writing if any he has why he should not be ordered to pay Defendants' costs and fees incurred in preparing for the settlement conference, including in t he preparation of Defendants confidential settlement statement. Defendant shall, on or before 2/11/2011, provide the court with an accounting of the costs and fees incurred in preparing for the settlement conference, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/7/11.(mnf, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. 56 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's (First) Motion to Compel Defendant to Surrender is granted and 37 Plaintiff's (First) Motion to Compel Defendant to Surrender will be stricken. 57 Defendant's Motion to St rike Plaintiff's (First) Motion to Compel Defendant to Disclose is granted and 38 Plaintiff's (First) Motion to Compel Defendant to Disclose will be stricken. The Motions Hearing scheduled for 2/9/2011 at 10:00 AM is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/4/11.(mnf, )
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/13/10. (ebs, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Minute Entry for Scheduling Conference held on 10/12/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, denying 22 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Discovery due by 4/19/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 5/19/2011. Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (Court Reporter FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/13/10. (ebs, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/27/10. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. City of Aurora, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georg K. Hill
Represented By: Derek W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?